Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/06/2018 at 11:04:57 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ VS VARGAS

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 HERNANDEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VARGAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3296

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANGELA HERNANDEZ

Corona, CA 92877

Respondent

JOB VARGAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • NOTICE RE: VOIDED DOCUMENT(S) AS TO ANGELA HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • FILING OF PETITION/SUMMONS/DEC OF RESIDENCE/NODA BY ANGELA HERNANDEZ IS HEREBY VOIDED FOR NON-PAYMENT OF FILING FEES WHICH WERE DUE BY 09/05/17 PURSUANT TO GC 68634(G).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • FEE WAIVER DENIED; ANGELA HERNANDEZ TO PAY $450.00 WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THE ORDER. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • FEE WAIVER DENIED-PAY WITHIN 10 DAYS SET 9/05/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWRF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ANGELA HERNANDEZ IS DEN; HONORABLE JUDGE GAIL A O'RANE (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • INITIAL FEE WAIVER FOR ANGELA HERNANDEZ TO BE RETURNED BY 08/21/17. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • FEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 8/21/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWRF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ANGELA HERNANDEZ (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT (JUDGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE CHRISTOPHER B. HARMON.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE CHRISTOPHER B. HARMON IN DEPARTMENT F402. (JUDGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • FAMILY LAW PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • HEARING RE: FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL/JUDGMENT SET 8/16/22 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • HEARING RE: NON PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 8/17/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT DATE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 10/16/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED - DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN) FILED 08/17/2017 OF ANGELA HERNANDEZ (FL-110/FL-210/FL-510)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • PETITIONER'S PLACE OF RESIDENCE CORONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DATE OF MARRIAGE (PETITIONER): 04/01/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DATE OF SEPARATION (PETITIONER): 06/20/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • PETITION FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less