This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/06/2018 at 08:28:38 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ VS NAVARRO

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 HERNANDEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NAVARRO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2887

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOEL HERNANDEZ

Riverside, CA 92503

Respondent

MARIA NAVARRO

Riverside, CA 92504

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED BY JOEL HERNANDEZ. (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION BY DECLARATION FILED BY JOEL HERNANDEZ; JUDGE CHAD W FIRETAG. (FL-180)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 02/02/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED ON 10/31/17 AND FORWARDED TO THE JUDGMENT DESK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY & FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOEL HERNANDEZ. (FL-141)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • UPDATE PARTY MARIA NAVARRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON THE DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN) FILED 07/21/2017 OF JOEL HERNANDEZ AS TO MARIA NAVARRO FILED. (FL-165/FL-620)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN) FILED 07/21/2017 OF JOEL HERNANDEZ SERVED ON MARIA NAVARRO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/01/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • --ALSO SERVED COMPL/BLANK DECL OF DISC,SCHED OF ASSETS/DBTS,IED ON MARIA NAVARRO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/01/17--

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED - DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN) FILED 07/21/2017 OF JOEL HERNANDEZ (FL-110/FL-210/FL-510)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DECLARATION OF RESIDENCE FILED BY JOEL HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT F401 (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • FAMILY LAW PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • HEARING RE: FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL/JUDGMENT SET 7/20/22 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • HEARING RE: NON PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 7/20/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DATE OF MARRIAGE (PETITIONER): 10/18/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DATE OF SEPARATION (PETITIONER): 06/06/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • PETITIONER'S PLACE OF RESIDENCE RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • PETITION FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less