This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 15:07:46 (UTC).

HELLING VS SALAZAR

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 HELLING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SALAZAR. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0839

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAMIAN HELLING

Defendant

ANA SALAZAR

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2017 OF DAMIAN HELLING AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2017 OF DAMIAN HELLING AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ANA SALAZAR WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/24/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2017 OF DAMIAN HELLING AS TO ANA SALAZAR, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2017 OF DAMIAN HELLING AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 05/24/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 06/09/17

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DAMIAN HELLING.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR AM

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR AMEND JUDGMENT BY DAMIAN HELLING FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

ORDER FOR AMEND JUDGMENT AND W

ORDER FOR AMEND JUDGMENT AND WRIT IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 06/23/17 S205 HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 06/23/17 S205 HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR AMEND JUDGMENT AND WRIT IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE TO AMEND JUDGMENT (SOUTHWEST).; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET 6/23/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR AMEND JUDGMENT BY DAMIAN HELLING FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DAMIAN HELLING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 06/09/17

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2017 OF DAMIAN HELLING AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ANA SALAZAR WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/24/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2017 OF DAMIAN HELLING AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 7/24/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less