This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/31/2020 at 00:32:22 (UTC).

HELD VS NITROINFUSIONS

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 HELD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NITROINFUSIONS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2999

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN HELD

PATRICIA KAY HELD

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PRIETO ENTERPRISESINC

OLD TOWN LA QUINTALLC

MARVIN INVESTMENTSINC

OLD TOWN LA QUINTAPROPERTY AND LEASING

SERNA & ASSOCIATES

S&N INSURANCE INC

NITROINFUSIONS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

MARVIN INVESTMENTSINC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY REGAR A PROFESSIONAL LAWCORPORATION

74-900 Highway 111 #223

Indian Wells, CA 92210

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

Po Box 64093

St Paul, MN 55164-0093

SCHNEIDER & LOWARYLLP

11900 W Olympic Blvd Ste 600

Los Angeles, CA 90064

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SCHNEIDER & LOWARYLLP

11900 W Olympic Blvd Ste 600

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PRIETO ENTERPRISESINC

DECLARATION OF BARRY REGAR RE

DECLARATION OF BARRY REGAR RE OSC WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCED $1500.00 FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY O

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY OLD TOWN LA QUINTALLC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY OLD TOWN LA QUINTALLC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY S

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY SERNA & ASSOCIATES FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PATRICIA KAY HELD, JOHN HELD

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PRIETO ENTERPRISESINC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/01/2019 OF PATRICIA HELD AS TO DEFENDANT S&N INSURANCE INC FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY PATRICIA KAY HELD, JOHN HELD FILED.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2019 OF MARVIN INVESTMENTSINC BY PRIETO ENTERPRISESINC REPRESENTED BY DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/CO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT/X-COMPLAINT/SUMMONS X-COMPLAINT SERVED ON PRIETO ENTERPRISES INC SERVED 07/12/19 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/01/2019 OF PATRICIA HELD BY SERNA & ASSOCIATES REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2019 OF MARVIN INVESTMENTSINC SERVED ON PRIETO ENTERPRISESINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/12/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY MARVIN INVESTMENTSINC, OLD TOWN LA QUINTALLC.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/01/2019 OF PATRICIA HELD BY PRIETO ENTERPRISESINC REPRESENTED BY DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY PRIETO ENTERPRISESINC.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2019 OF MARVIN INVESTMENTSINC AS TO NITROINFUSIONS; MAILING DATE OF 07/09/19 FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketFILED: TRIAL SETTING ORDER-JUDGE CRAIG G RIEMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PRIETO ENTERPRISESINC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketPATRICIA KAY HELD, JOHN HELD/BARRY REGAR A PROFESSIONAL LAWCORPORATION IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY SERNA & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY SERNA & ASSOCIATES FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF BARRY REGAR RE OSC WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCED $1500.00 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY OLD TOWN LA QUINTALLC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketJURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY OLD TOWN LA QUINTALLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/01/2019 OF PATRICIA HELD AS TO NITROINFUSIONS; MAILING DATE OF 05/21/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/01/2019 OF PATRICIA HELD SERVED ON MARVIN INVESTMENTSINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/20/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/01/2019 OF PATRICIA HELD SERVED ON OLD TOWN LA QUINTAPROPERTY ANDLEASING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/20/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/01/2019 OF PATRICIA HELD SERVED ON OLD TOWN LA QUINTALLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/20/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/01/2019 OF PATRICIA HELD AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 7/01/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92253.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less