Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/19/2020 at 00:45:47 (UTC).

HEIDLER VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 HEIDLER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2782

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARRY HEIDLER II

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUILL & ARROW LLP

10900 Wilshire Blvd Ste. 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2020 OF LARRY HEIDLER SERVED ON GENERAL MOTORS LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/20 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2020 OF LARRY HEIDLER AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92555.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingDept: 10; Action text: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2020 OF LARRY HEIDLER SERVED ON GENERAL MOTORS LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/20 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 11/17/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2020 OF LARRY HEIDLER AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92555.

    Read MoreRead Less