This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/22/2021 at 08:35:16 (UTC).

HEARTLAND GRADING vs TMS CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 HEARTLAND GRADING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TMS CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carol A. Greene. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3783

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

HEARTLAND GRADING

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC

TMS CONSTRUCTION INC

TMS GS

SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE LLC

TMSGC

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HEARTLAND GRADING

SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC

TMS CONSTRUCTION INC

TMS GS

SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE LLC

TMSGC

GEORGE KRIKORIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

12544 High Bluff Drive Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Lewis Pernicka

James C Earle

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

03/16/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

01/19/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

Minute Order: Non-Proof of Service Clerk's Tracking Hearing (Non-Appearance)

01/19/2021: Minute Order: Non-Proof of Service Clerk's Tracking Hearing (Non-Appearance)

Notice of Entry of order consolidating cases for all purposes

12/24/2020: Notice of Entry of order consolidating cases for all purposes

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of HEARTLAND GRADING

12/17/2020: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of HEARTLAND GRADING

Notice of Document Return.

12/16/2020: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service RE Showprop Menifee, LLC's Answer to Complaint and Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC

12/16/2020: Proof of Service RE Showprop Menifee, LLC's Answer to Complaint and Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC

Heartland Grading, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint of TMS Construction, Inc. on Cross-Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION INC

12/08/2020: Heartland Grading, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint of TMS Construction, Inc. on Cross-Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION INC

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL on Complaint of HEARTLAND GRADING

11/19/2020: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL on Complaint of HEARTLAND GRADING

Summons Issued and Filed

11/04/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

09/28/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

09/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint of HEARTLAND GRADING and filed.

09/17/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of HEARTLAND GRADING and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92584.

09/17/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92584.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Non-Proof of Service Clerk's Tracking Hearing (Non-Appearance)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of order consolidating cases for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/17/2020; Fine Description: eSubmit *8171 Receipt No.: 20201217-00022.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of HEARTLAND GRADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Showprop Menifee, LLC's Answer to Complaint on Complaint of HEARTLAND GRADING; Filed By: SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint of HEARTLAND GRADING; Filed By: TMS CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketFilings: Cross-Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/24/2020; Fine Description: Check #7718 Receipt No.: CV200928-0093-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of HEARTLAND GRADING and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92584.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of HEARTLAND GRADING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TMSGC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EARLE, JAMES C