This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 11:25:26 (UTC).

HE VS ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 HE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDERSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0426

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIN HE

Defendant

BARBARA ANDERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

5437 Laurel Canyon Blvd Second Floor

Valley Village, CA 91607

Defendant Attorney

INLAND COUNTIES LEGAL SERVICES

1040 Iowa Ave Suite 109

Riverside, CA 92507

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92586.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2017 OF LIN HE AND FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2017 OF LIN HE BY BARBARA ANDERSON REPRESENTED BY INLAND COUNTIES LEGAL SERVICES FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT FILED BY BARBARA ANDERSON ON DENNIS P BLOCK ESQ WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/14/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BARBARA ANDERSON IS GRANTED; CLERK D. ROMO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LIN HE - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2017 OF LIN HE AS TO BARBARA ANDERSON WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/29/17

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UN

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 05/05/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 05/05/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET 5/05/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2017 OF LIN HE AS TO BARBARA ANDERSON WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LIN HE - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • FEE WAIVER FOR BARBARA ANDERSON WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; $255.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BARBARA ANDERSON IS GRANTED; CLERK D. ROMO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2017
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY LIN HE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/10/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2017 OF LIN HE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92586.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less