Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:01:07 (UTC).

HAWKINS VS AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/29/2015 HAWKINS filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1112

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELLEN HAWKINS

Defendants

GRINNELL, LLC

HAJOCA CORPORATION

HERCULES INCORPORATED

INLAND WATER WORKSSUPPLY CO

J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC

K-M INDUSTRIES HOLDING CO, INC

KEENAN PROPERTIES INC

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC

MS2G, INC

SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANYINC

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

WESTBURNE SUPPLY, INC

WESTERN WATER WORKS SUPPLY COMPANY

JOE CLIFFORD HAWKINS

RUTH HAWKINS

AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEARD ROBINS CLOUDLLP

808 Wilshire Blvd Ste 450

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant Attorneys

MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Twenty Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

MANION GAYNOR & MANNING LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2150

Los Angeles, CA 90071

WFBM LLP DBAWALSWORTH

One City Boulevard West Fifth Floor

Orange, CA 92868

POLSINELLI LLP

2049 Century Park East #2900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

POLSINELLI

2049 Century Park East #2900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd #4300

Los Angeles, CA 90017

BERKES CRANE ROBINSON & SEAL LLP

515 S Figueroa St #1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

HAWKINS PARNELL THACKSTON & YOUNG

445 S. Figueroa St #3200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

HILLYARD BARNES & REINHOLTZ

310 Golden Shore Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ

310 Golden Shore 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

HUGO PARKER LLP

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

WFBM LLP

601 Montgomery St, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

FOLEY & MANSFIELD LLP

300 S Grand Ave Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

PERKINS COIE LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

POND NORTH LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR OR

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ORDER ALLOWING ITS MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ELLEN HAWKINS AS TO FAMILIAN CORPORATION FILED.

ORDER DENYING J-M MANUFACTURIN

ORDER DENYING J-M MANUFACTURINGS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MSJ; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

DECLARATION OF SHERRIE S DIVEG

DECLARATION OF SHERRIE S DIVEGLIA IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED

DECLARATION OF SARAH N. BENDON

DECLARATION OF SARAH N. BENDON IN SUPPORT OF PLFTS OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF CARRIE S. LIN I

DECLARATION OF CARRIE S. LIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FILED

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ELLEN

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ELLEN HAWKINS FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ELLEN HAWKINS BY CALAVERAS ASBESTOS,LTD REPRESENTED BY FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DECLARATION OF OF NON OPPOSITI

DECLARATION OF OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO 2ND AMEND COMPLAINT BY SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY FILED

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBL

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS -- DENIED FILED.

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ELLEN HAWKINS BY HAJOCA CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY MANION GAYNOR & MANNING LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ELLEN HAWKINS BY MS2G, INC REPRESENTED BY HILLYARD BARNES & REINHOLTZ FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ELLEN HAWKINS BY KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC REPRESENTED BY DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WESTERN WATER WORKSSUPPLY COMPANY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HERCULES INCORPORATED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTI

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

304 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ARI FRIEDMAN IN RESPONSE TO THIS COURTS OSC RE:DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ELLEN HAWKINS AS TO SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANYINC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ELLEN HAWKINS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO INLAND WATER WORKSSUPPLY CO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT AS TO CALAVERAS ASBESTOS ONLY AS TO CALAVERAS ASBESTOS,LTD.; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ELLEN HAWKINS AS TO J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
678 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2015
  • FAX FILING BY ELLEN HAWKINS ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ELLEN HAWKINS FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2015 OF ELLEN HAWKINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST DECLARATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92505.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05 - COMPLEX CASE (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE SET 3/30/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2015 OF ELLEN HAWKINS AS TO ELLEN HAWKINS CHANGE ATTORNEY PRO/PER TO ATTORNEY HEARD ROBINS CLOUDLLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K-M INDUSTRIES HOLDING CO., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN WATER WORKS SUPPLY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Hercules LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. is a litigant