Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/25/2017 at 17:09:39 (UTC).

HARRINGTON VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 HARRINGTON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5006

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCIS XAVIER HARRINGTON

Defendants

RIVERSIDE METRO AUTO GROUP LLC

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNIGHT LAW GROUP LLP

1801 Century Pk East Ste 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92504.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF FRANCIS HARRINGTON SERVED ON VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OFAMERICA INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/22/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF FRANCIS HARRINGTON AND FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY FRANC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY FRANCIS XAVIER HARRINGTON FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FOR CONSUME

AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FOR CONSUMER LEGAL REMEDIES ACT CLAIM BY FRANCIS XAVIER HARRINGTON FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF FRANCIS HARRINGTON AS TO RIVERSIDE METRO AUTO GROUP LLC; MAILING DATE OF 03/28/17 FILED.

NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOV

NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF FRANCIS HARRINGTON SERVED ON VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OFAMERICA INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/22/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY FRANCIS XAVIER HARRINGTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF FRANCIS HARRINGTON AS TO RIVERSIDE METRO AUTO GROUP LLC; MAILING DATE OF 03/28/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF FRANCIS HARRINGTON SERVED ON VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OFAMERICA INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/22/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF FRANCIS HARRINGTON SERVED ON VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OFAMERICA INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/22/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SUBMITTED BY FRANCIS XAVIER HARRINGTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY FRANCIS XAVIER HARRINGTON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF FRANCIS HARRINGTON AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92504.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FOR CONSUMER LEGAL REMEDIES ACT CLAIM BY FRANCIS XAVIER HARRINGTON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 5/22/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less