This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 10:05:50 (UTC).

HAMPTON vs RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 HAMPTON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jackson Lucky, Harold W. Hopp and L. Jackson Lucky IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0793

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jackson Lucky

Harold W. Hopp

L. Jackson Lucky IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRI HAMPTON

Defendants

WOLDE-AB ISAAC

RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAGNER ZEMMING CHRISTENSEN LLP

Attorney at WAGNER ZEMMING CHRISTENSEN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Dennis John Walsh

WALSH & ASSOCIATES, APC

 

Court Documents

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RE: PLTFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, WOLDE-AB ISAAC

09/10/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RE: PLTFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, WOLDE-AB ISAAC

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, WOLDE-AB ISAAC

09/10/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, WOLDE-AB ISAAC

Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint TERRI HAMPTON

12/30/2020: Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint TERRI HAMPTON

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

07/20/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to appear at the 6/8/21 Trial Setting Conference as to RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, WOLDE-AB ISAAC, Dennis John Wals

07/20/2021: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to appear at the 6/8/21 Trial Setting Conference as to RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, WOLDE-AB ISAAC, Dennis John Walsh

Declaration of Dennis J Walsh in Response to Order to Show Cause Hearing on July 20, 2021

07/07/2021: Declaration of Dennis J Walsh in Response to Order to Show Cause Hearing on July 20, 2021

Notice of Order to Show Cause For Failure to Appear

06/08/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause For Failure to Appear

Certificate of Mailing

06/08/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

06/08/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on 1st Amended Complaint of TERRI HAMPTON

04/28/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on 1st Amended Complaint of TERRI HAMPTON

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

03/16/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

Case Management Statement

03/02/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

03/01/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

01/22/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Answer to Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint TERRI HAMPTON

01/22/2021: Answer to Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint TERRI HAMPTON

Notice of Document Return.

01/14/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Certificate of Mailing

01/07/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

01/07/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to appear at the 6/8/21 Trial Setting Conference as to RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, WOLDE-AB ISAAC, Dennis John Walsh; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to appear at the 6/8/21 Trial Setting Conference as to RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, WOLDE-AB ISAAC, Dennis John Walsh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Dennis J Walsh in Response to Order to Show Cause Hearing on July 20, 2021; Filed By: RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT; WOLDE-AB ISAAC; Dennis John Walsh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause For Failure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the 1st Amended Complaint of HAMPTON served on WOLDE-AB ISAAC with service date of 02/27/20 filed.(Personal Service) on 1st Amended Complaint of TERRI HAMPTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/25/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment Receipt No.: CV200225-0547-FE.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Complaint of HAMPTON Filed. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/21/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #1401 Receipt No.: CV200221-0659-FE.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/21/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #1401 Receipt No.: CV200221-0637-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92501.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of HAMPTON and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.