This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/22/2020 at 00:13:15 (UTC).

HALLE PROPERTIES VS HARBER

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 HALLE PROPERTIES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HARBER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3841

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

HALLE PROPERTIES, LLC

DEBORAH K HARBER

TRACY HARBER

ROBERT W HARBER

JAMES B HARBER

THE REINALT-THOMASCORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DISCOUNT TIRE CO INC

Not Classified By Court

RIC1903844 EFFECTIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SCHORR LAW

FABOZZI & MILLER, APC

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2019 OF ROBERT HARBER FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNM

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES HEARING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO 04/20/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT 04.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HALLE PROPERTIES, LLC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROBERT W HARBER, TRACY HARBER, DEBORAH K HARBER, JAMES B HARBER

NOTICE OF JURY DEMAND AND CIVI

NOTICE OF JURY DEMAND AND CIVIL DEPOSIT BY HALLE PROPERTIES, LLC FILED.

CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FROM CA

CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FROM CASE # RIC1903844 FILED

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92557.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CONSOLIDATED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2019 OF ROBERT HARBER AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: /O

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: /OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNENT.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOL

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2019 OF ROBERT HARBER SERVED ON HALLE PROPERTIES, LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/22/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOL

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2019 OF ROBERT HARBER SERVED ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIADISCOUNT TIRE CO INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/22/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY ROBERT W HARBER, TRACY HARBER, DEBORAH K HARBER, JAMES B HARBER FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: /O

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: /OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CONSOLIDAT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2019 OF ROBERT HARBER BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON THE REINALT-THOMASCORPORATION ON 07/22/19. CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN CARD SIGNED BY CT CORPORATIO SYSTEM PHOENIX ARIZONA.

MOTION TO/FOR PRELIMINARY INJU

MOTION TO/FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY ROBERT W HARBER, TRACY HARBER, DEBORAH K HARBER, JAMES B HARBER FILED

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY HALLE PROPERTIES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO 04 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES HEARING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO 04/20/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT 04.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketTRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET ON 4/20/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 04.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketTRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET ON 4/20/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 01 - RESCHEDULED TO:.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY HALLE PROPERTIES, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY HALLE PROPERTIES, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2019 OF ROBERT HARBER FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 11/13/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92557.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2019 OF HALLE PROPERTIES, LLC AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY HALLE PROPERTIES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FROM CASE # RIC1903844 FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92557.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2019 OF ROBERT HARBER AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less