This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 11:59:57 (UTC).

HAFEZ & HAFEZ

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 HAFEZ HAFEZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Belinda A. Handy and Samra Furbush. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7063

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Belinda A. Handy

Samra Furbush

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHEREF HAFEZ

Respondent

KARINA HAFEZ

Not Classified By Court

JAMES HAFEZ

LANDON HAFEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Amanda Beth Naples

Respondent Attorney

Chandra Lynn Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • HearingType: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Samra Furbush; Location/Courtroom: Department F201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Judgment; Filed By: SHEREF HAFEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Findings and Order After Hearing, Transcript; Filed By: SHEREF HAFEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Preparing copies/copy fees (GC 70627A); Amount: $3.00; Paid: $3.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/04/2021; Fine Description: Check #57577 Receipt No.: 20211004-00513.1; Paid: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Request for Order re: Attorney Fees and Cost, Child Custody, Child Support, Property Control, Spousal or Partner Support, Visitation, Other: Forensic Accountant Fees & Costs filed on 01/05/2021 KARINA HAFEZ, Chandra Lynn Moss; Judicial Officer: Samra Furbush; Location/Courtroom: Department F201; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Request for Order re: Attorney Fees and Cost, Child Custody, Child Support, Property Control, Spousal or Partner Support, Visitation, Other: Forensic Accountant Fees & Costs filed on 01/05/2021 KARINA HAFEZ, Chandra Lynn Moss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/16/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2560 Receipt No.: 20210916-00302.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Memorandum 9/16/2021; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Stipulated Agreement pursuant to referral to Child Custody Recommending Counseling; CCRC 9/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Completion of On-Line Course; Filed By: SHEREF HAFEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Petition or other first paper (including a joint petition) for dissolution of marriage or domestic partnership, legal separation, or nullity (GC70670B); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/19/2020; Fine Description: Check #46539 Receipt No.: 20201119-00344.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Family Law Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Failure to Bring Case to Trial or Judgment; Expiration Date: 11/16/2025; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Schedule a Case Status Conference; Expiration Date: 11/17/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SHEREF HAFEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036); Filed By: SHEREF HAFEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) (FL-105/GC-120); Filed By: SHEREF HAFEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100; Filed By: SHEREF HAFEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketFilings: Dissolution of Marriage With Child(ren) filed by SHEREF HAFEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSS CHANDRA LYNN