This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 20:09:16 (UTC).

HADDADIN VS BEST

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 HADDADIN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BEST. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1378

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NAJWA A HADDADIN

MAJED F HADDADIN

Defendant

MICHELE BEST

Murrieta, CA 92563

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT A KRASNEY

362 West 6Th St

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2017 OF MAJED HADDADIN AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2017 OF MAJED HADDADIN BY MICHELE BEST REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MICHELE BEST IS GRANTED; CLERK J PRENDERGAST (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2017 OF MAJED HADDADIN BY MAJED F HADDADIN, NAJWA A HADDADIN REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT A KRASNEY

DECLARATION OF /IN SUPPORT OF

DECLARATION OF /IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ALL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED

POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE: MOT

POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENSES

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $$920.00 BY MAJED F HADDADIN, NAJWA A HADDADIN FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2017 OF MAJED HADDADIN AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UN

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTIO

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY MAJED F HADDADIN, NAJWA A HADDADIN FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMA

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY MICHELE BEST FILED

JUDGMENT FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/15/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MAJED F HADDADIN, NAJWA A HADDADIN.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MAJED F HADDADIN, NAJWA A HADDADIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/15/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2017 OF MAJED HADDADIN BY MAJED F HADDADIN, NAJWA A HADDADIN; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY MICHELE BEST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY MAJED F HADDADIN, NAJWA A HADDADIN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON ROBERT A KRASNEY ESQ WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/22/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2017 OF MAJED HADDADIN BY MICHELE BEST REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/16/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2017 OF MAJED HADDADIN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less