This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2018 at 15:45:09 (UTC).

H YOUNESI DDS INC VS CARLOS ESPANA DDS

Case Summary

On 06/14/2012 H YOUNESI DDS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARLOS ESPANA DDS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1275

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

H YOUNESI DDS INC

Defendant and Appellant

CARLOS ESPANA DDS

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED (INDIO)

CERTIFIED MAIL SENT TO CARLOS

CERTIFIED MAIL SENT TO CARLOS ESPANA DDS. CERTIFIED MAIL NUMBER 7009 2250 0004 3662 3597 WITH MAILING FEE OF $10.00.

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UN-SER

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UN-SERVED AS TO CARLOS ESPANA DDS.

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLA

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 06/14/2012 OF H YOUNESI DDS INC RESET; REASON: NEED MORE TIME TO SERVE FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLA

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 06/14/2012 OF H YOUNESI DDS INC RESET; REASON: PER MINUTE ORDER/NO POS FILED FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLA

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 06/14/2012 OF H YOUNESI DDS INC RESET; REASON: UNABLE TO SERVE TO BE SET PER COURT ORDER FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF PL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF PLTFS CLAIM & ORDER/FICT BUS NAME ON CARLOS ESPANA DDS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/22/12 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 06/14/2012 OF H YOUNESI DDS INC AS TO CARLOS ESPANA DDS SUB-SERVED WIFE; MAILING DATE OF 11/08/12 FILED. COST OF $75.00

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF RE-SETTING SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CERTIFICATE MAILING.

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION BY CARLOS ESPANA DDS FILED. (SMALL CLAIMS)

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON SMALL CLA

NOTICE OF HEARING ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MI

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MINUTE ORDER DATED 2/1/13 AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

SMALL CLAIMS REQUEST FOR COURT

SMALL CLAIMS REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER, PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 06/14/2012 OF H YOUNESI DDS INC FILED BY H YOUNESI DDS INC. (SC-105 PAGE 1 OF 2)

SMALL CLAIMS ORDER ON REQUEST

SMALL CLAIMS ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 06/14/2012 OF H YOUNESI DDS INC FILED BY H YOUNESI DDS INC; HONORABLE JUDGE B J BJORK. (SC-105A)

SMALL CLAIMS ANSWER TO REQUEST

SMALL CLAIMS ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER; SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED 01/16/2013 OF CARLOS ESPANA DDS FILED BY CARLOS ESPANA DDS. (SC-105 PAGE 2 OF 2)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketHEARING RE: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER; Disposition: Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketEX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING SET 3/11/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 1D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket170.6 FILED BY CARLOS ESPANA DDS AGAINST JUDGE B J BJORK GRANTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketEX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING SET 3/11/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 1D - RESCHEDULED TO:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketEX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING SET 3/11/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 1C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketHEARING IS SET ON 3/28/13 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 1D - RESCHEDULED TO:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketHEARING IS SET ON 3/28/13 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 1C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketEX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING; Disposition: Hearing Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • DocketFAX FILING BY CARLOS ESPANA DDS ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER; SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED 01/16/2013 OF CARLOS ESPANA DDS FILED BY CARLOS ESPANA DDS. (SC-105 PAGE 2 OF 2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2012
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING INDIO; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING INDIO; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (INDIO) FILED 06/14/2012 OF H YOUNESI DDS INC RESET; REASON: NEED MORE TIME TO SERVE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 8/23/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 1C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UN-SERVED AS TO CARLOS ESPANA DDS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL SENT TO CARLOS ESPANA DDS. CERTIFIED MAIL NUMBER 7009 2250 0004 3662 3597 WITH MAILING FEE OF $10.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT 1C (INDIO).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (INDIO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 7/19/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 1C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED (INDIO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less