Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/13/2021 at 04:09:57 (UTC).

GUTIERREZ vs MUNGUIA

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 GUTIERREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MUNGUIA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4358

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROCIO GUTIERREZ

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JOE ANTHONY MUNGUIA

CRST LINCOLN SALESINC

EVA LINDA TRAVIS

CRST LINCOLN SALES INC

CRST EXPEDITED, INC

GARDNER TRUCKING, INC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

EVA LINDA TRAVIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GENE J GOLDSMAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GENE J GOLDSMAN

501 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Edward Richard Leonard

Patrick Joseph Gibbs Andrew Benny Leal

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick Joseph Gibbs Andrew Benny Leal

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

05/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

05/10/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Request for Dismissal

05/06/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725

04/16/2021: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725

Case Management Statement

04/08/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

04/21/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/21/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint Incorrect Name of Doe 2 on Complaint of ROCIO GUTIERREZ

02/25/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint Incorrect Name of Doe 2 on Complaint of ROCIO GUTIERREZ

Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of EVA LINDA TRAVIS

02/24/2021: Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of EVA LINDA TRAVIS

Answer to Complaint on Complaint of ROCIO GUTIERREZ

01/12/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint of ROCIO GUTIERREZ

DFENDANTS JOE ANTHONY MUNGUIA AND CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL on Complaint of ROCIO GUTIERREZ

01/07/2021: DFENDANTS JOE ANTHONY MUNGUIA AND CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL on Complaint of ROCIO GUTIERREZ

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

01/07/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

System Generated Notice re: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

11/03/2020: System Generated Notice re: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

10/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

10/29/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

Summons Issued on Complaint of GUTIERREZ and filed.

10/29/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of GUTIERREZ and filed.

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

10/29/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to Patrick Joseph Gibbs, Andrew Benny Leal, EVA LINDA TRAVIS; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to Edward Richard Leonard, CRST LINCOLN SALES INC, JOE ANTHONY MUNGUIA; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file timely proof of service on all cross-defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(c) as to Patrick Joseph Gibbs, Andrew Benny Leal, EVA LINDA TRAVIS; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to ROCIO GUTIERREZ, LAW OFFICES OF GENE J GOLDSMAN; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint of ROCIO GUTIERREZ; Filed By: ROCIO GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketFilings: Cross-Complaint of EVA LINDA TRAVIS; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 05/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.; Filed By: JOE ANTHONY MUNGUIA; CRST LINCOLN SALES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: DFENDANTS JOE ANTHONY MUNGUIA AND CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL on Complaint of ROCIO GUTIERREZ; Filed By: JOE ANTHONY MUNGUIA; CRST LINCOLN SALES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/02/2020; Fine Description: Check #3758494 Receipt No.: CV201103-0271-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of GUTIERREZ and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of ROCIO GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRST LINCOLN SALES INC. AN IOWA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDNER TRUCKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CRST Expedited, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEONARD, EDWARD RICHARD