This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 14:40:58 (UTC).

GUILD MORTGAGE CO VS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 05/18/2016 GUILD MORTGAGE CO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0919

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUILD MORTGAGE CO

Defendant

JUANA GARCIA

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALDRIDGE PITE, LLP

4375 Jutland Drive, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92177-0935

 

Court Documents

FILED: RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSE

FILED: RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION -SATISFIED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY GUILD MORTGAGE CO.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 06/16/16

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS B

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS BY GUILD MORTGAGE CO FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/18/2016 OF GUILD MORTGAGE CO AS TO JUANA GARCIA, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/18/2016 OF GUILD MORTGAGE CO AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 05/23/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/18/2016 OF GUILD MORTGAGE CO AS TO JUANA GARCIA; MAILING DATE OF 05/23/16 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/18/2016 OF GUILD MORTGAGE CO AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92544.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2016
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED: RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION -SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY GUILD MORTGAGE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 06/16/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS BY GUILD MORTGAGE CO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/18/2016 OF GUILD MORTGAGE CO AS TO JUANA GARCIA, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/18/2016 OF GUILD MORTGAGE CO AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 05/23/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/18/2016 OF GUILD MORTGAGE CO AS TO JUANA GARCIA; MAILING DATE OF 05/23/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 7/18/16 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/18/2016 OF GUILD MORTGAGE CO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92544.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Guild Mortgage Company, a California Corporation is a litigant