This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/24/2020 at 06:05:40 (UTC).

GUERRERO V. ALTMAN SPECIALTY PLANTS

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 GUERRERO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ALTMAN SPECIALTY PLANTS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3741

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELFINO GUERRERO

Defendant

ALTMAN SPECIALTY PLANTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMAILI & ASSOCIATES PC

600 W Santa Ana Blvd #202

Santa Ana, CA 92701

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2020 OF DELFINO GUERRERO AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY DELFINO GUERRERO IS GRA; CLERK K. THOMSEN (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • HearingDept: 07; Action text: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • HearingDept: CLER; Action text: NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 11/23/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/29/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2020 OF DELFINO GUERRERO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DELFINO GUERRERO (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FOR DELFINO GUERRERO WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; $450.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY DELFINO GUERRERO IS GRA; CLERK K. THOMSEN (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less