This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/12/2018 at 06:12:12 (UTC).

GUARANTY COLLECTION VS. FUSON

Case Summary

On 05/09/2003 GUARANTY COLLECTION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FUSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9740

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUARANTY COLLECTION CO., INC.

Defendant

DEANNA C. FUSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT L SUSNOW

26500 W. Aguora Road #102-502

Calabasas, CA 91302

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFA

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, DEANNA C. FUSON FILED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; UN

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; UNSATISFIED/ORANGE COUNTY

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 11/26/03

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2003 OF GUARANTY COLLECTIONCO., INC. AS TO DEANNA C. FUSON FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2003 OF GUARANTY COLLECTIONCO., INC. FILED.

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY GUARANTY COLLECTIONCO., INC.

DECLARATION OF IN SUPP/DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF IN SUPP/DEFAULT APPLICATION CCP 585D FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2003 OF GUARANTY COLLECTIONCO., INC. RETURNED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2003 OF GUARANTY COLLECTIONCO., INC. SERVED ON DEANNA C. FUSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/25/03 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, DEANNA C. FUSON FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; UNSATISFIED/ORANGE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2004
  • Docket--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $132.72 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $32.00 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2004
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; ORANGE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • Docket--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $28.17 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2003
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2003 OF GUARANTY COLLECTIONCO., INC. FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY GUARANTY COLLECTIONCO., INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF IN SUPP/DEFAULT APPLICATION CCP 585D FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2003 OF GUARANTY COLLECTIONCO., INC. RETURNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2003
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2003 OF GUARANTY COLLECTIONCO., INC. SERVED ON DEANNA C. FUSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/25/03 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2003
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • DocketNON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 7/18/03 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • DocketDIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 08 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUARANTY COLLECTION COMPANY INC. is a litigant