This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/06/2022 at 19:58:03 (UTC).

GRIFFIN vs RIVERSIDE CITY COLLEGE

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 GRIFFIN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against RIVERSIDE CITY COLLEGE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chad Firetag and Firetag from the Case and Replace him with a New Judge. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1742

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chad Firetag

Firetag from the Case and Replace him with a New Judge

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TIA GRIFFIN

DAELANI GRIFFIN

Defendants

RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE

NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTR

NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE BOARD

RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

FULLERTON COLLEGE

RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE POLICE DEPARTME

RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT POLICE DEPARTMENT

NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

RIVERSIDE CITY COLLEGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MEYERS FOZI & DWORK LLP

Attorney at MEYERS FOZI & DWORK LLP

Teresa C. Chow

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling dated 6-2-22 Ordered to be Final Ruling

06/02/2022: Tentative Ruling dated 6-2-22 Ordered to be Final Ruling

Minute Order: Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment Entered Due to Additional "New Evidence"

06/02/2022: Minute Order: Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment Entered Due to Additional "New Evidence"

Minute Order: Plaintiff's Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reinstate the Defendants Riverside Community College Police Department

06/02/2022: Minute Order: Plaintiff's Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reinstate the Defendants Riverside Community College Police Department

Declaration of Dyanne J. Cho in Support of Riverside Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's (1) Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment Entered Due to Additional "New Evidence"

05/19/2022: Declaration of Dyanne J. Cho in Support of Riverside Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's (1) Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment Entered Due to Additional "New Evidence"

Opposition to Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reinstate the Defendants Riverside Community College Police Department as Defendants on 2nd Amended Complaint TIA GRIFFIN

05/19/2022: Opposition to Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reinstate the Defendants Riverside Community College Police Department as Defendants on 2nd Amended Complaint TIA GRIFFIN

Opposition to Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment entered due to additional "New Evidence" on 2nd Amended Complaint TIA GRIFFIN

05/19/2022: Opposition to Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment entered due to additional "New Evidence" on 2nd Amended Complaint TIA GRIFFIN

Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)

04/28/2022: Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)

Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)

04/28/2022: Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)

Amended Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/25/2022: Amended Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Certificate of Mailing

04/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/25/2022: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. (Statement of Disqualification/Challenge for Cause)

04/22/2022: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. (Statement of Disqualification/Challenge for Cause)

Order Striking Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Judge Firetag and Verified Answer

04/22/2022: Order Striking Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Judge Firetag and Verified Answer

Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment Entered Due to Additional "New Evidence"

04/18/2022: Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment Entered Due to Additional "New Evidence"

Proof of Service Civil

04/18/2022: Proof of Service Civil

Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Remove the Honorable Judge Firetag from the Case and Replace him with a New Judge

04/18/2022: Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Remove the Honorable Judge Firetag from the Case and Replace him with a New Judge

Plaintiff's Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reinstate the Defendants Riverside Community College Police Department

04/18/2022: Plaintiff's Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reinstate the Defendants Riverside Community College Police Department

Order from District Court of Appeal Appeal is DISMISSED as abandoned on Appeal of Judgment TIA GRIFFIN

04/12/2022: Order from District Court of Appeal Appeal is DISMISSED as abandoned on Appeal of Judgment TIA GRIFFIN

276 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • HearingType: Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment Entered Due to Additional "New Evidence"; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • HearingType: Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Remove the Honorable Judge Firetag from the Case and Replace him with a New Judge; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • HearingType: Plaintiff's Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reinstate the Defendants Riverside Community College Police Department; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment Entered Due to Additional "New Evidence"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Plaintiff's Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reinstate the Defendants Riverside Community College Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Tentative Ruling dated 6-2-22 Ordered to be Final Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Dyanne J. Cho in Support of Riverside Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's (1) Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment Entered Due to Additional "New Evidence"; Filed By: RIVERSIDE CITY COLLEGE; RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT; RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT POLICE DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Opposition to Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reinstate the Defendants Riverside Community College Police Department as Defendants on 2nd Amended Complaint TIA GRIFFIN; Filed By: RIVERSIDE CITY COLLEGE; RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT; RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT POLICE DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Opposition to Plaintiffs Tia Griffin and Daelani Griffin's Motion to Reopen the Case by Vacating the Judgment entered due to additional "New Evidence" on 2nd Amended Complaint TIA GRIFFIN; Filed By: RIVERSIDE CITY COLLEGE; RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT; RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT POLICE DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
330 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice: Waiver of Court Fees Filed. Application filed by TIA GRIFFIN on 06/19/20 is Granted by Operation of Law (FW-005).; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Case reassigned to Department 03 for all future proceedings. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees filed by TIA GRIFFIN (Form FW-001).; Filed By: TIA GRIFFIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees filed by DAELANI GRIFFIN (Form FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT & CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of GRIFFIN and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed - Complex Case. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FULLERTON COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW TERESA C.