Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/26/2016 at 06:18:26 (UTC).

GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS VS. HIGHLAND PLASTICS

Case Summary

On 04/01/2003 GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against HIGHLAND PLASTICS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1107

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAFAEL CHAVEZ MARTINEZ

TRINIDAD RODRIGUEZ

EFIGENO SANCHEZ MORENO

LUZ GRACIELA HERNANDEZ

PORFIRIO MANZANERO

JOSE C MANZANERO

GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION DISTRICT COUNC

Defendants

WILLIAM WARREN

JAMES NELSON

VIRGINIA WARREN

HIGHLAND PLASTICS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILBERT & SACKMAN

6100 Wilshire Blvd #700

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Defendant Attorney

BRUNICK BATTERSBY MCELHANEY & BECKETT

1839 Commercenter West Post Office Box 6425

San Bernardino, CA 92412

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION DISTRICT COUNC SERVED ON HIGHLAND PLASTICS INC FILED; DATE OF MAILING 07/21/03

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HIGHLAND PLASTICS INC

STIPULATION CONFIDENTIALITY AG

STIPULATION CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION DISTRICT COUNC BY WILLIAM WARREN REPRESENTED BY BRUNICK BATTERSBY MCELHANEY & BECKETT FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

AMENDED ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED

AMENDED ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION DISTRICT COUNC BY JAMES NELSON FILED

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: REQUE

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: REQUEST FOR ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF/TO EX PARTE FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION DISTRICT COUNC FILED.

PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF

PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; OBJECTIONS TO BY HIGHLAND PLASTICS INC, JAMES NELSON, WILLIAM WARREN, VIRGINIA WARREN FILED

DECLARATION OF OF IAN D THOMAS

DECLARATION OF OF IAN D THOMAS IN SUPPORT OF NTC OF NEW CASE IN OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGM

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; CORRECTIONS BY GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION DISTRICT COUNC FILED

OPPOSITION TO PLTFS MTN FOR LE

OPPOSITION TO PLTFS MTN FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLT BY HIGHLAND PLASTICS INC, JAMES NELSON, WILLIAM WARREN, VIRGINIA WARREN FILED

REPLY TO APPLICATION FOR LEAVE

REPLY TO APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLT BY GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION DISTRICT COUNC FILED

REPLY TO /IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

REPLY TO /IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE BY JOSE C MANZANERO FILED

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF A

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL PETITIONERS ORDERED FILE RPTRS TRANSCRIPT E038025.

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF A

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL PETITION WRIT/MANDATE & REQUEST FOR STAY DENIED.

ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER NO.

ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER NO. 2 IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE STEPHEN D CUNNISON.

DECLARATION OF OF ROBERT J STO

DECLARATION OF OF ROBERT J STOCK IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS MTN TO APPROVE CLASS SETTLEMENT FILED FILED

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2008
  • TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2007
  • TRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET ON 2/01/08 AT 11:00 IN DEPT. 01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE STEPHEN D CUNNISON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • CALENDARED ON CLERK'S CALENDAR FOR TRACKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2007
  • HEARING RE: STATUS; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF JOHN KEANE RE NOTICE PROCEDURES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF CLASS ACTION BY GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION DISTRICT COUNC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE STEPHEN D CUNNISON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2007
  • CALENDARED ON CLERK'S CALENDAR FOR TRACKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2007
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR APPROVE CLASS SETTLEMENT BY PORFIRIO MANZANERO, RAFAEL CHAVEZ MARTINEZ; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2003
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HRG ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION DISTRICT COUNC; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • STIP ALLOWING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO BE FILED REC'D & FORWD TO DEPT. 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET ON 7/10/03 @ 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION DISTRICT COUNC FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ALLOWING THE FILING OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRA; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F ETTINGER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/01/2003 OF GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION DISTRICT COUNC BY HIGHLAND PLASTICS INC REPRESENTED BY BRUNICK BATTERSBY MCELHANEY & BECKETT FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2003
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 6/10/03 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2003
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10 FOR ALL PURPOSES; Disposition: Assigned to Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less