Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/05/2016 at 19:27:26 (UTC).

GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC VS RUIZ

Case Summary

On 10/27/2015 GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0390

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC

Defendants

MARLON RUIZ

Beaumont, CA 92223

DIWENY RUIZ

Beaumont, CA 92223

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF LIDDLE & LIDDLE

310 South Vermont Ave

Glendora, CA 91741

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC BY MARLON RUIZ, DIWENY RUIZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MARLON RUIZ IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON LAW OFFICE OF LIDDLE AND LIDDLE WITH A MAILING DATE OF 11/03/15 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY DIWENY RUIZ IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MARLON RUIZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/27/15 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DIWENY RUIZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/27/15 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 10/27/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UD

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UD TRIAL.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR DIWENY RUIZ AS TO NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL; REASON RETURNED: RETURN TO SENDER/UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR MARLON RUIZ AS TO NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL; REASON RETURNED: RETURN TO SENDER/UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 11/25/15, AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UD TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 10/27/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2015
  • FEE WAIVER FOR MARLON RUIZ WAS GRANTED FOR ANSWER; $255.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GOVIND PROPERTIES LLC BY MARLON RUIZ, DIWENY RUIZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 12/28/15 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less