This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/08/2016 at 19:36:53 (UTC).

GONZALEZ VS COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8444

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TONY O GONZALEZ JR

Defendants

MARK GIRGUIS, M.D.

VINAY YAGNIK, M.D.

FRANK ARKO, M.D.

DOE REYES

DOE MONTES

DOE T NELSON

DOE BEAL

DOE HUGHES

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

ST BERNARDINA MEDICAL CENTER

LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER

FACULTY MEDICAL GROUP OF LOMA LINDA

PALO VERDE HEALTHCARE DISTRICT

PALO VERDE HOSPITAL

YASMINA BOYD, D.O.

FRED SHU M.D.

JOAN ELAINE HAYNES-LEE, M.D.

FACULTY PHYSICIANS& SURGEONS OF LOMA LINDA

DIGNITY HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PATRICIA A LAW

10837 Laurel Street Suite 101

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant Attorneys

WINET PATRICK GAYER CREIGHTON & HANES

1199 East Ramon Rd

Palm Springs, CA 92264

KRAMER DEBOER & KEANE

74-770 Us Highway 111 #201

Indian Wells, CA 92210

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

650 East Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

DAVIS GRASS GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY

3105 Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD & STOCKALPER

1230 Rosecrans Ave. Suite 450

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

WARFORD, ROBERT K

215 North "D" Street Suite 303

San Bernardino, CA 92401

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN MCKENNA &

111 W Ocean Blvd, 14Th Floor P O Box 22636

Long Beach, CA 90801-5636

THOMPSON & COLEGATE

P.O. Box 1299 3610 14Th St.

Riverside, CA 92502

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2015 OF TONY GONZALEZ BY DIGNITY HEALTH REPRESENTED BY THOMPSON & COLEGATE FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2015 OF TONY GONZALEZ BY MARK GIRGUIS, M.D. REPRESENTED BY WINET PATRICK GAYERCREIGHTON &HANES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2015 OF TONY GONZALEZ BY FRANK ARKO, M.D. REPRESENTED BY KRAMER DEBOER & KEANE FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FRED SHU M.D.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PALO VERDE HEALTHCARE DISTRICT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MTN TO

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TONY GONZALEZ BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, JOAN ELAINE HAYNES-LEE, M.D., MARK GIRGUIS, M.D., VINAY YAGNIK, M.D., FACULTY PHYSICIANS& SURGEONS OF LOMA LINDA REPRESENTED BY WINET PATRICK GAYERCREIGHTON &HANES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

JOINDER TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER

JOINDER TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING THE PRODUCTION FILED BY DIGNITY HEALTH. (GENERAL MOTION/EX-PARTE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TONY O GONZALEZ JR

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY L

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, JOAN ELAINE HAYNES-LEE, M.D., MARK GIRGUIS, M.D., VINAY YAGNIK, M.D., FACULTY PHYSICIANS& SURGEONS OF LOMA LINDA FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

JOINDER TO DIGNITY HEALTHS REP

JOINDER TO DIGNITY HEALTHS REPLY TO OPPO TO MTN FILED BY FRANK ARKO, M.D.. (GENERAL MOTION/EX-PARTE)

REPLY TO OPPO TO MTN FOR ORDR

REPLY TO OPPO TO MTN FOR ORDR TO COMPEL PROD OF RECORDS BY DIGNITY HEALTH FILED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARI

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS BY FRANK ARKO, M.D. FILED.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF YASMIN

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF YASMINA BOYD D.O.S JOINDER TO MTN FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING THE PROD BY YASMINA BOYD, D.O. FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED ATERIAL FACTS

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TONY GONZALEZ BY DIGNITY HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TONY GONZALEZ BY YASMINA BOYD, D.O.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR 10/26/16 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFT DIGNITY HEALTHS MSJ INCLUDING DECL OF MAXINE M MORISAKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED ATERIAL FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ROBERT T GOLDWEBER MD IN SUPPORT OF DEFT DIGNITY HEALTHS MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TONY GONZALEZ BY DIGNITY HEALTH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
167 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2015
  • COURT REPORTER HEARING FEE FOR ONE HOUR OR LESS PAID BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00; FOR HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE ON 01/25/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • HEARING RESERVED SET 01/25/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 04 - RES50010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR NOTI OF DEPT ASSIGN & CMC AS TO RTN TO SEND; REASON RETURNED: NO SUCH STREET UNABLE TO FRWD L/O PATRICIA A LAW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92502.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • FAX FILING BY TONY O GONZALEZ JR ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less