This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/02/2019 at 21:11:38 (UTC).

GONZALEZ V ROBERTS

Case Summary

On 07/03/2017 GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ROBERTS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3481

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EDUARDO ESPINOZA

GABRIELA GONZALEZ

MONICA DOMINGUEZ

Defendants

JKC CATHEDRAL CITYINC A OREGON CORPORATION

JKC PALM SPRINGS AUTOMOTIVE INC AN OREGON

DOUG ROBERTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CEPHAS LAW FIRM

72-960 Fred Waring Drive

Palm Desert, CA 92260

Defendant Attorney

THE SCALI LAW FIRM

800 Wilshire Blvd #400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) CAUSES OF ACTION 1/2/3/4/5/6/7/9 AS TO DOUG ROBERTS, JKC PALM SPRINGS AUTOMOTIVE INCAN OREGON, JKC CATHEDRAL CITYINC A OREGONCORPORATION FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO FILE SECOND AMENDEDCOMPLAINT IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JANET I KINTNER.

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GABRI

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GABRIELA GONZALEZ FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY GABRIELA GONZALEZ, EDUARDO ESPINOZA.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92234.

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GABRI

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GABRIELA GONZALEZ FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTICATE OF MAILING.

MINUTE ORDER: ADVANCE CASE MAN

MINUTE ORDER: ADVANCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

GENERAL DENIAL TO 1ST AMENDED

GENERAL DENIAL TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GABRIELA GONZALEZ BY JKC PALM SPRINGS AUTOMOTIVE INCAN OREGON REPRESENTED BY THE SCALI LAW FIRM FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GABRIELA GONZALEZ AS TO JKC PALM SPRINGS AUTOMOTIVE INCAN OREGON; MAILING DATE OF 09/08/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GABRIELA GONZALEZ AS TO JKC CATHEDRAL CITYINC A OREGONCORPORATION; MAILING DATE OF 09/08/17 FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GABRIELA GONZALEZ, EDUARDO ESPINOZA

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JKC PALM SPRINGS AUTOMOTIVE INCAN OREGON, JKC CATHEDRAL CITYINC A OREGONCORPORATION

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 6/25/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) FOR ALL PAGA CLAIMS 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION AS TO DOUG ROBERTS, JKC PALM SPRINGS AUTOMOTIVE INCAN OREGON, JKC CATHEDRAL CITYINC A OREGONCORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) CAUSES OF ACTION 1/2/3/4/5/6/7/9 AS TO DOUG ROBERTS, JKC PALM SPRINGS AUTOMOTIVE INCAN OREGON, JKC CATHEDRAL CITYINC A OREGONCORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C) SET 6/25/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GABRIELA GONZALEZ FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: ADVANCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF GABRIELA GONZALEZ FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY GABRIELA GONZALEZ, EDUARDO ESPINOZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92234.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2017 OF GABRIELA GONZALEZ AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 9/01/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY GABRIELA GONZALEZ, EDUARDO ESPINOZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less