This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/24/2017 at 02:55:44 (UTC).

GONZALES VS SHAMROCK FOODS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2017 GONZALES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SHAMROCK FOODS COMPANY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9581

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYNTHIA GONZALES

Defendant

SHAMROCK FOODS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZADIAN LAW GROUP PC

790 E Colorado Blvd 9Th Floor

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorney

CONN MACIEL CAREY LLP

870 Market St #1111

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/26/2017 OF CYNTHIA GONZALES BY SHAMROCK FOODS COMPANY REPRESENTED BY CONN MACIEL CAREY LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOV

NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED.

NOTICE TO FILE DOCUMENTS FROM

NOTICE TO FILE DOCUMENTS FROM FEDERAL COURT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

170.6 CCP FILED BY SHAMROCK FO

170.6 CCP FILED BY SHAMROCK FOODS COMPANY AGAINST JUDGE IRMA POOLE ASBERRY IS GRANTED.

DEF SHAMROCK FOODS CO.S MTN FO

DEF SHAMROCK FOODS CO.S MTN FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE, DECL OF ANDREW J. SOMMER

CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT

CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CYNTHIA GONZALES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SHAMROCK FOODS COMPANY

DECLARATION OF ANDREW J SOMMER

DECLARATION OF ANDREW J SOMMER RE MATERIAL FEDERAL PLEADINGS FILED

NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIAT

NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION FILED; PROPOSED MEDIATOR MNNK. MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE 12/12/17.

RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF COURT OR

RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION FILED BY SHAMROCK FOODS COMPANY

STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONA

STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT ( FIRST FILED BY SUZANNE V CHAMBERLAIN (FORM ADR-100).; Disposition: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: TR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/26/2017 OF CYNTHIA GONZALES AND FILED.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (NOTICE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT/NONAGREEMENT DUE - CLERK'S CALENDAR.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE 12/12/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC RE FAILURE TO COMPLETE COURT MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL FROM MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT ( FIRST FILED BY SUZANNE V CHAMBERLAIN (FORM ADR-100).; Disposition: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 8/14/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO FILE DOCUMENTS FROM FEDERAL COURT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/26/2017 OF CYNTHIA GONZALES BY SHAMROCK FOODS COMPANY REPRESENTED BY CONN MACIEL CAREY LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 7/25/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/26/2017 OF CYNTHIA GONZALES AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 91752.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less