This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/20/2016 at 12:38:57 (UTC).

GOMEZ VS SILVA

Case Summary

On 03/26/2002 GOMEZ filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against SILVA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2810

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2002

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EDMUND GOMEZ

CYNTHIA GOMEZ

Defendants

RUDY SILVA

CFC MORTGAGE CORPORATION

STATEWIDE FUNDING CORPORATION

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR

GLORIA SILVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON MCPHARLIN& CONNERS LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3623

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FILED

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FILED BY EDMUND GOMEZ, CYNTHIA GOMEZ

NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE

NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO FILED

ORDER FOR TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRE

ORDER FOR TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUCTION AND TEMP IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: TEMPO

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: TEMPORARY RESTR. ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION OF/TO MTN FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY RUDY SILVA, GLORIA SILVA FILED.

OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTE

OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN CONN WITH PRELIM INJCTGN FILED BY RUDY SILVA, GLORIA SILVA

REPLY TO BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF P

REPLY TO BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PRELIM INJUNCTION BY EDMUND GOMEZ, CYNTHIA GOMEZ FILED

RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO DEC

RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO DEC OF PLAS IN SUPPORT PRELIM INJ BY EDMUND GOMEZ, CYNTHIA GOMEZ FILED.

ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTI

ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2002
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2002
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2002
  • CHECK #0 IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2002 OF EDMUND GOMEZ ORDERED TRANSFERRED TO THE SUPERIOR COURT--COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE - INDIO BRANCH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2002
  • TRANSFERRED TO THE SUPERIOR COURT--COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE - INDIO BRANCH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2002
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORD SENT TO THE SUPERIOR COURT--COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE - INDIO BRANCH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2002
  • HEARING RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO DEC OF PLAS IN SUPPORT PRELIM INJ BY EDMUND GOMEZ, CYNTHIA GOMEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: TEMPORARY RESTR. ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUCTION AND TEMP IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE TRO.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FILED BY EDMUND GOMEZ, CYNTHIA GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2002
  • MOTION FEE POSTED BY EDMUND GOMEZ, CYNTHIA GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2002
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 3/29/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2002
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 5/30/02 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2002
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less