This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/06/2022 at 06:32:10 (UTC).

PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION vs CANADAY HOMES/LLQ LLC

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CANADAY HOMES/LLQ LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Manuel Bustamante, Angel M. Bermudez and David M Chapman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5516

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Manuel Bustamante

Angel M. Bermudez

David M Chapman

 

Party Details

Defendants

GERO W KNUTH AND HEIDI KNUTH

SECURITY TRUST COMPANY AS CUSTODIAN OF IRA

THOMAS J MEADOWS

MERCER R MACPHERSON AND CAROL A MACPHERSON

JOHN A GUSTAFSON AND ARLENE C GUSTAFSON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

08/01/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

Amended Default Judgment

07/01/2022: Amended Default Judgment

Certificate of Mailing

06/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

06/29/2022: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Declaration of Alexander J. Lauvray in Response to Order to Show Cause

06/23/2022: Declaration of Alexander J. Lauvray in Response to Order to Show Cause

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

05/17/2022: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

04/21/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

Judgment

04/14/2022: Judgment

Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove Up as to Canaday Homes/LLQ LLC

04/14/2022: Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove Up as to Canaday Homes/LLQ LLC

Plaintiff's Exhibit List on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

04/08/2022: Plaintiff's Exhibit List on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

Plaintiff's Witness List on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

04/08/2022: Plaintiff's Witness List on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice

04/08/2022: Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Document Return.

03/22/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Minute Order: Default Judgment Review - Non-Appearance

03/23/2022: Minute Order: Default Judgment Review - Non-Appearance

Declaration of Sergio Olmo in support of Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default Judgment on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

01/14/2022: Declaration of Sergio Olmo in support of Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default Judgment on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

Application for Entry of Default Judment on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

01/14/2022: Application for Entry of Default Judment on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

Request for Dismissal

01/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Court Judgment on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

01/14/2022: Request for Court Judgment on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

209 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a default judgment pursuant to CRC 3.110(h) as to PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER WEISS LLP; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC; Filed By: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Possession; Applies to: Case; For/Against: For - PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION Against - CANADAY HOMES/LLQ LLC Against - POINT CENTER FINANCIAL INC Against - ESCROW PROFESSIONALS INC Against - GUMERSINDO Y GARCIA AND GLORIA F GARCIA Against - LINCOLN TRUST COMPANY AS CUSTODIAN OF IRA Against - LINCOLN TRUST COMPANY AS CUSTODIAN OF IRA Against - LINCOLN TRUST COMPANY AS CUSTODIAN OF IRA Against - GABRIEL LEDERER Against - CHARLES E METRO AND BETTY J METRO Against - LAWRENCE D MALCOLM AND ROSE J MALCOLM Against - KAMAL I NAFFA AND GULNAR H NAFFA Against - ISMAEL SALAZAR AND YOLANDA SALAZAR Against - TOBY ARGANDONA AND ANGIE ARGANDONA Against - JOHN A GUSTAFSON AND ARLENE C GUSTAFSON Against - MERCER R MACPHERSON AND CAROL A MACPHERSON Against - HAROLD L TILBURY JR AND YOLANDA O TILBURY Against - GERO W KNUTH AND HEIDI KNUTH Against - KENT C LILLY Against - CHERYL ELAINE GAECHTER Against - SUSAN D. MASON; Details; Possession: 47660 Via Florence La Quinta CA 92253

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amended Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a default judgment pursuant to CRC 3.110(h) as to PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER WEISS LLP; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/30/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220630-01393.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Amended Default Judgment; Filed By: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION; Confidential: YES Confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
180 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of /RE: DILIGENCE AS TO CANADAY HOMES filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF PENDENCY OF ACTION by GMAC MORTGAGE LLC filed.; Filed By: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92253.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of GMAC MORTGAGE LLC; Disposition: Default Judgment by Court 04/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/31/2019; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV190808-0016-V.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECURITY TRUST COMPANY AS CUSTODIAN OF IRA is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHN A. PULEO AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN A PULEO TRUST DATED JULY 28 2020 is a litigant