This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/18/2016 at 15:55:22 (UTC).

GLORIA SALUTO VS. RIVERSIDE COURT

Case Summary

On 05/22/2012 GLORIA SALUTO filed an Other lawsuit against RIVERSIDE COURT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Hall Of Justice located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0165

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GLORIA SALUTO

Respondent

BLYTHE COURT

Interested Party

HSBC BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WASS, GEORGE S

400 S. El Ciclo Rd. Ste J

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Respondent Attorney

DESERT JUDICIAL DISTRICT - CIVIL

265 N Broadway

Blythe, CA 92225

Interested Party Attorney

PITE DUNCAN LLP

4375 Jutland Drive Suite 200 P.O. Box 17935

San Diego, CA 92177

Other Attorneys

GEORGE S WASS

400 S. El Ciclo Rd. Ste J

Palm Springs, CA 92262

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL PETITION FOR WRI

LIMITED CIVIL PETITION FOR WRIT (APPELLATE DIVISION) CASE

FILE: PETITIONERS TRANSCRIPT O

FILE: PETITIONERS TRANSCRIPT OF 04/30/12

FILE: PETITIONERS EXHIBITS IN

FILE: PETITIONERS EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PET/WRIT

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY GLORIA SALUTO IS GRANTED; CLERK L.SERRANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER.

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF P&AS

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF P&AS OPPOSITION TO PET/WRIT/MANDATE

FILE: ORDER ON PET/WRIT/MANDAT

FILE: ORDER ON PET/WRIT/MANDATE -GRANTED

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 07/12/12 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. PETITIONER SHALL RECOVER HIS COSTS ON APPEAL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 07/12/12 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. PETITIONER SHALL RECOVER HIS COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: ORDER ON PET/WRIT/MANDATE -GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 7/12/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 10A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE COURTS RULING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • PETITIONERS REPLY DUE 07/02/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF P&AS OPPOSITION TO PET/WRIT/MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING- RESPONSE DUE 06/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 6/05/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 10A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE COURTS ORDER ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GLORIA SALUTO (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY GLORIA SALUTO IS GRANTED; CLERK L.SERRANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FOR GLORIA SALUTO WAS GRANTED FOR FILING FEE FOR PET/WRIT/MANDATE; $225.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • APPELLATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT NOTICE. JUDGE JEFFREY J. PREVOST ASSIGNED. ORIGINAL PETITION FORWARDED TO RESEARCH ATTORNEY JORJE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • APPELLATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT NOTICE. JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN ASSIGNED. ORIGINAL PETITION FORWARDED TO RESEARCH ATTORNEY JORJE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • TRIAL COURT CASE #BLC1100279

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: PETITIONERS EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PET/WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: PETITIONERS TRANSCRIPT OF 04/30/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL PETITION FOR WRIT (APPELLATE DIVISION) CASE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.