This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/03/2016 at 20:43:36 (UTC).

GLAVIANO VS CORONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 07/17/2014 GLAVIANO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CORONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7114

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHERYL GLAVIANO

Defendants

CORONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

CHIDAO LE NGUYEN DO

MOHAMMAD MAZEN JAMAL MD

MAHESH SURANJAN DESILVA MD

SUN MAR MANAGEMENTSERVICES INC.

JOEL A PENGSON MD

DOUGLAS EARL CASEY MD

SUNIL GUL SUJAN MD

ANDY YANG MD

KEITH JEROME MCCARTY MD

RIVERSIDE EQUITIESLLC

JOHN DAVID HUSTED MD

DARICE LIU MD

ROBERT ISAAC CHANG MD

RUSSELL BRIAN KEATING MD

UHS CORONA INC

BRUCE H OMIYA MD

MICHELLE DIEP DINH MD

KINDRED HEALTHCAREINC.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HARRIS, SCOTT S

555 West Beech Street Suite 303

San Diego, CA 92101

CHIVINSKY LAW FIRM

1350 Columbia St #401

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

SCHMID & VOILES

333 City Boulevard West Suite 720

Orange, CA 92868-2924

POLIQUIN & DEGRAVELLP

22972 Mill Creek Drive

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

633 West 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

PRINDLE AMARO GOETZ HILLYARD BARNES &

310 Golden Shore Fourth Floor P.O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

DUMMIT, BUCHHOLZ & TRAPP

101 West Broadway Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101-8122

Other Attorneys

LAW BRANDMEYER & PACKER LLP

245 S. Los Robles Ave #600

Pasadena, CA 91101

GIOVANNIELLO LAW GROUP

1 Pointe Drive, Suite 300

Brea, CA 92821

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY C

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CHERYL GLAVIANO FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY AIMEE NICOLE FRENCH MD.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS NOT IMPOSED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2014 OF CHERYL GLAVIANO BY KND DEVELOPMENT 55LCC REPRESENTED BY GIOVANNIELLO LAW GROUP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DECLARATION OF OF HEATHER BARR

DECLARATION OF OF HEATHER BARRETT IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL CONTRACTUAL ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2014 OF CHERYL GLAVIANO SERVED ON CHIDAO LE NGUYEN DO FILED; DATE OF MAILING 03/24/15

NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR

NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR DMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY RIVERSIDE EQUITIESLLC FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY JOEL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY JOEL A PENGSON MD FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RIVERSIDE EQUITIESLLC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY UHS CORONA INC

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF OSC HRG.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: PETITION

NOTICE OF RULING RE: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION GRANTED FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2014 OF CHERYL GLAVIANO AS TO JOHN DAVID HUSTED MD FILED

DECLARATION OF SERVICE FILED

DECLARATION OF SERVICE FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR RE P

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR RE PLAS W/DRW OF ALL CLAIMS FOR PAST & FUTURE LOS IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN D. MOLLOY.

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2014 OF CHERYL GLAVIANO AS TO PLAINTIFF CHERYL GLAVIANO ADDING ATTORNEY CHIVINSKY LAW FIRM FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY KND DEVELOPMENT 55LCC FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2016
  • OSC HEARING RE: COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION AS TO CHERYL GLAVIANO, THOMAS TAK ENG MD, AIMEE NICOLE FRENCH MD, JOHN DAVID HUSTED MD, MOHAMMAD MAZEN JAMAL MD, CHIDAO LE NGUYEN DO, JOEL A PENGSON MD, UHS CORONA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • OSC HEARING RE: COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION AS TO CHERYL GLAVIANO, THOMAS TAK ENG MD, AIMEE NICOLE FRENCH MD, JOHN DAVID HUSTED MD, MOHAMMAD MAZEN JAMAL MD, CHIDAO LE NGUYEN DO, JOEL A PENGSON MD, UHS CORONA INC.; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING BY CHERYL GLAVIANO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • OSC HEARING RE: COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION AS TO CHERYL GLAVIANO, THOMAS TAK ENG MD, AIMEE NICOLE FRENCH MD, JOHN DAVID HUSTED MD, MOHAMMAD MAZEN JAMAL MD, CHIDAO LE NGUYEN DO, JOEL A PENGSON MD, UHS CORONA INC.; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT OSC RE ARBITRATION BY JOEL A PENGSON MD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2014 OF CHERYL GLAVIANO AS TO THOMAS TAK ENG MD FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: CONTINUANCE - CONTINUANCE - RES50682; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY CHERYL GLAVIANO; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR L EAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
208 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2014 OF CHERYL GLAVIANO SERVED ON CORONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/08/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER: RE 1/13/15 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CHERYL GLAVIANO FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2014 OF CHERYL GLAVIANO SERVED ON JOEL A PENGSON MD FILED; DATE OF MAILING 12/08/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS IN DEPARTMENT 10 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92882.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less