This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/24/2018 at 01:12:38 (UTC).

GILBERT TAPIA VS. PRODUCT B, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/09/2006 GILBERT TAPIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRODUCT B, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6605

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

ANA M TAPIA

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

GILBERT TAPIA

Claimant

JEFFREY M YOSS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DAMON SISKIN

ANA M TAPIA

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

GILBERT TAPIA

DOROTHY CUSICK

PRODUCT B LLC

Po Box 1189

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

PRODUCT B LLC

Po Box 1189

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BONNHEIM, WILLIAM S

39-301 Badger Street Suite 800

Palm Desert, CA 92211

HALL & BAILEY

6761 Brockton Avenue

Riverside, CA 92506

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 Town Center Dr #1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Claimant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JEFF M YOSS

2825 East Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite B109

Palm Springs, CA 92262

LAW OFFICE OF JEFFM YOSS

2825 East Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite B109

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Cross Defendant Attorney

MODEL & YOSS

2825 E Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite D-1

Palm Springs, CA 92262

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2006 OF GILBERT TAPIA SERVED ON DOROTHY CUSICK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/03/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2006 OF GILBERT TAPIA BY DOROTHY CUSICK REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2006 OF GILBERT TAPIA REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT L PIPPIN FOR PARTY(S) ANA M TAPIA AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY MODEL & YOSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2006 OF PRODUCT B LLC SERVED ON FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/27/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOROTHY CUSICK

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE AND OSC HRG BY GILBERT TAPIA, ANA M TAPIA FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2006 OF GILBERT TAPIA SERVED ON FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/28/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT-IN-INTERPL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT-IN-INTERPLEADER FILED 05/20/2010 OF FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY BY GILBERT TAPIA, ANA M TAPIA REPRESENTED BY WILLIAM S BONNHEIM FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

MOTION TO/FOR (APP) ORDER DISC

MOTION TO/FOR (APP) ORDER DISCHARGING FIRST AMERICAN FROM LIABILITY AND DISMISSING IT FROM THE ACTION BY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN OR

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER DISCHARGING FIRST BY PLAINTIFF FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2006 OF GILBERT TAPIA AS TO DEFENDANT DAMON SISKIN FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FO

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FOR ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS FILED

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT ON

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2006 OF GILBERT TAPIA AS TO PRODUCT B LLC FILED

ORDER FOR DEPOSIT FUNDS/DISCHA

ORDER FOR DEPOSIT FUNDS/DISCHARGE/DISMISS 1ST AMERICAN IS GRANTED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR REFU

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR REFUND OF MONIES FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED ON COMPLA

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2006 OF GILBERT TAPIA AGAINST GILBERT TAPIA, ANA M TAPIA BY JEFFREY M YOSS.

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • CK#3320012858 $58023.13 2/24/11 SENT TO GILBERT & ANA TAPIA C/O BONNHEIM ATTNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • TRUST EXONERATE-POSTED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • TRUST EXONERATION - INTEREST BEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • TRUST DEPOSIT - POSTED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, PRODUCT B LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIEN FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2006 OF GILBERT TAPIA AGAINST GILBERT TAPIA, ANA M TAPIA BY JEFFREY M YOSS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR REFUND OF MONIES FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF INTERPLED FUNDS PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER BY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • TRUST DEPOSIT - INTEREST BEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2006
  • FAX FEE PAID FOR 67.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2006 OF GILBERT TAPIA BY PRODUCT B LLC REPRESENTED BY SCHLECHT, SHEVLIN &SHOENBERGER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PRODUCT B LLC REPRESENTED BY SCHLECHT, SHEVLIN &SHOENBERGER FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2006
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2006 OF GILBERT TAPIA SERVED ON DOROTHY CUSICK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/03/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2006 OF GILBERT TAPIA SERVED ON PRODUCT B LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/28/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.