Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 20:51:30 (UTC).

GIBSON vs MAGNOLIA MANOR APARTMENTS

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 GIBSON filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against MAGNOLIA MANOR APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1444

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THAIS GIBSON

Defendants

MAGNOLIA MANOR APARTMENTS

AA2 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAWN STEEL LAW FIRM

Attorney at SHAWN STEEL LAW FIRM

3010 Old Ranch Pkwy, Ste 260

Seal Beach, CA 90740

Defendant Attorneys

Scott Brian Spriggs

Scott Brian Spriggs Scott Brian Spriggs

 

Court Documents

Mediator's Notice of Acceptance or Recusal

02/16/2021: Mediator's Notice of Acceptance or Recusal

Notice of Court Assigned Mediator

01/26/2021: Notice of Court Assigned Mediator

Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

12/28/2020: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

Certificate of Mailing

12/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File

11/23/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

11/23/2020: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

11/18/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint of THAIS GIBSON

11/04/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint of THAIS GIBSON

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of GIBSON as to AA2 LLC; mailing date of 09/11/20 filed.

09/16/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of GIBSON as to AA2 LLC; mailing date of 09/11/20 filed.

Amendment to Complaint of GIBSON Naming Does 01 to be AA2 LLC filed.

08/18/2020: Amendment to Complaint of GIBSON Naming Does 01 to be AA2 LLC filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92504.

06/02/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92504.

System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

06/02/2020: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Mediator's Notice of Acceptance or Recusal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Court Assigned Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to THAIS GIBSON, SHAWN STEEL LAW FIRM; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Mediation Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement Due; Expiration Date: 05/13/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of GIBSON as to AA2 LLC; mailing date of 09/11/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of GIBSON served on MAGNOLIA MANOR APARTMENTS with service date of 08/28/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of THAIS GIBSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amendment to Complaint of GIBSON Naming Does 01 to be AA2 LLC filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/08/2020; Fine Description: Check #2008 Receipt No.: CV200608-0336-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92504.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of GIBSON and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of THAIS GIBSON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AA2 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPRIGGS SCOTT B.