Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/22/2016 at 07:39:28 (UTC).

GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK VS MANGOLD

Case Summary

On 10/10/2012 GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MANGOLD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0264

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Blythe Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendant

PAULA MANGOLD

Blythe, CA 92225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PC

199 S Los Robles Ave Suite 410

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 26

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 (COLLECTION) - BLYTHE

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92225.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 10/10/2012 OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK AND FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 10/10/2012 OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK SERVED ON PAULA MANGOLD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/21/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTIO

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 10/10/2012 OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 BY PAULA MANGOLD REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED.

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - COLLECTIONS - FILED.

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF MAN

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BY PAULA MANGOLD FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTI

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MA

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE/COURT TRIAL.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MANDA

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL BY GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK FILED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR AP

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL BY GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL BY GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK.

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL REGARDI

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL REGARDING NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED

DECLARATION OF OF PLAINTIFFS C

DECLARATION OF OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF EX

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TR ON PAULA MANGOLD WITH A MAILING DATE OF 05/08/13 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2013
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (COLLECTION); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • HEARING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF COURT TRIA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • --ALSO SERVED PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING COURT TRIAL ON PAULA MANGOLD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/08/13--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • --ALSO SERVED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT ON PAULA MANGOLD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/08/13--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • --ALSO SERVED DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE NOTICE OF EX PARTE ON PAULA MANGOLD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/08/13--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • --ALSO SERVED DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN SUPPORT COURT ON PAULA MANGOLD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/08/13--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING COURT TR ON PAULA MANGOLD WITH A MAILING DATE OF 05/08/13 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2012
  • QAED ALL DOCS/IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 10/10/2012 OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK SERVED ON PAULA MANGOLD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/21/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • QAED ALL DOCS/IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 10/11/13 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 10/10/2012 OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92225.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (BLYTHE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 (COLLECTION) - BLYTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less