This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 14:38:51 (UTC).

GASTON VS C&J CLARK RETAIL INC

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 GASTON filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against C J CLARK RETAIL INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sunshine Sykes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4224

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sunshine Sykes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVANGELINE D GASTON

Defendant

C&J CLARK RETAIL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BIBIYAN LAW GROUP APC

1801 Century Park East Ste 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

BIBIYAN LAW GROUP,P.C.

8484 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 500

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

BIBIYAN LAW GROUP, P.C.

Attorney at BIBIYAN LAW GROUP, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

50 California St 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4615

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NT

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF ASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CRC 3.722).

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/12/2019 OF EVANGELINE GASTON AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92230.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED - CLASS ACTION

COMPLAINT FILED - CLASS ACTION. (RIVERSIDE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/12/2019 OF EVANGELINE GASTON SERVED ON C&J CLARK RETAIL INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/16/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

PLAINTIFFS REPORT RE CASE MANA

PLAINTIFFS REPORT RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY EVANGELINE D GASTON FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY EVANGELINE D GASTON FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EVANGELINE D GASTON

CLASS ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT O

CLASS ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1; HONORABLE SUNSHINE S. SYKES

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES RE: CA

JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION BY EVANGELINE D GASTON FILED.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORED

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT OREDER BY EVANGELINE D GASTON FILED.

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Joint Report of Parties re: Case Management Conference; Filed By: EVANGELINE D GASTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • HearingType: OSC Hearing re: Why Case Should not be Consolidated with RIC1905210 as to EVANGELINE D GASTON.; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of GASTON served on C&J CLARK RETAIL INC with service date of 08/16/19 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of EVANGELINE D GASTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $500.00; Paid: $500.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/12/2019; Fine Description: Check #4003785/4003786 Receipt No.: CV190812-0569-CK.1; Paid: $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $500.00; Paid: $500.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/12/2019; Fine Description: Check #4003785/4003786 Receipt No.: CV190812-0568-CK.1; Paid: $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/12/2019; Fine Description: Check #4003787 Receipt No.: CV190812-0556-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NTC OF ASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CRC 3.722).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92230.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of GASTON and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed - Class Action. (Riverside)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of EVANGELINE D GASTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & J Clark Retail, Inc. is a litigant