This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 16:47:44 (UTC).

GASTON vs C & J CLARK RETAIL INC

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 GASTON filed an Other lawsuit against C J CLARK RETAIL INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUNSHINE S. SYKES and Sunshine Sykes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5210

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

SUNSHINE S. SYKES

Sunshine Sykes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVANGELINE D GASTON

Defendants

C & J CLARK RETAILINC

C & J CLARK RETAIL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BIBIYAN LAW GROUP APC

1801 Century Park East Ste 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

BIBIYAN LAW GROUP,P.C.

8484 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 500

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

BIBIYAN LAW GROUP, P.C.

Attorney at BIBIYAN LAW GROUP, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

50 California St 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4615

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

08/31/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Certificate of Mailing

06/02/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

06/02/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Joint report of parties RE: case management conference

05/26/2021: Joint report of parties RE: case management conference

Certificate of Mailing

04/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/12/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Supplemental joint report of parties re: case management conference

04/06/2021: Supplemental joint report of parties re: case management conference

Certificate of Mailing

02/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

02/17/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Supplemental Joint Report of Parties Re: Case Management Conference

02/10/2021: Supplemental Joint Report of Parties Re: Case Management Conference

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

01/12/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Supplemental Joint Report of Parties re: Case Management Conference

01/12/2021: Supplemental Joint Report of Parties re: Case Management Conference

Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference

09/29/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference

System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

09/14/2020: System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference

06/03/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Status Conference

JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES RE INITIAL CMC

06/01/2020: JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES RE INITIAL CMC

Notice OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION by EVANGELINE D GASTON filed.

06/01/2020: Notice OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION by EVANGELINE D GASTON filed.

System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

05/28/2020: System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • HearingType: Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingType: Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • HearingType: OSC Hearing re: Why Case Should not be Consolidated with RIC1904224 as to EVANGELINE D GASTON.; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • HearingType: Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Joint report of parties RE: case management conference; Filed By: EVANGELINE D GASTON; C & J CLARK RETAIL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/16/2019; Fine Description: Check #198458 Receipt No.: CV191016-0666-CK.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/16/2019; Fine Description: Check #198458 Receipt No.: CV191016-0641-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPT AND CMC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92230.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of GASTON and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed - Complex Case. (Riverside)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of EVANGELINE D GASTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & J Clark Retail, Inc. is a litigant