This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/05/2020 at 11:25:59 (UTC).

GARDNER VS KE DURASOL AWNINGS

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 GARDNER filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against KE DURASOL AWNINGS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0442

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT GARDNER

Intervenor Plaintiffs and Intervenors

MID-CENTRY INSURANCE COPANY

MID-CENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY

Claimant

DONALD R HOLBEN & ASSOCIATES APC

5030 Camino De La Siesta Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

ROBERT BONTE

KE DURASOL AWNINGSINC

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Intervenor Defendant

KE DURASOL AWNINGSINC

Cross Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

ROES 1 THROUGH 10

SHADEMAKER INC

ANTHONY RAMSEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THON BECK VANNI CALLAHAN & POWELL

1100 E Green Street

Pasadena, CA 91106-2513

Intervenor Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorneys

SMITH & SUSSON LLP

2 Corporate Plaza Drive Suite 275

Newport Beach, CA 02660

SUSSON LAW

2 Corporate Plaza Drive Suite 275

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Claimant Attorney

DONALD R HOLBEN & ASSOCIATES

5030 Camino De La Siesta Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Intervenor Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MUHAR GARBER AV& DUNCAN

Po Box 51457

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS OF THON BECK VANNI CALLAHAN & POWELL FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY KE DURASOL AWNINGSINC

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 6/5/2020.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2019 OF ROBERT GARDNER REMOVE ATTORNEY SMITH & SUSSON LLP FOR PARTY(S) MID-CENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY SUSSON LAW

ORDER RE: TRIAL SETTING ORDER

ORDER RE: TRIAL SETTING ORDER HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNM

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES HEARING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO 03/03/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS2.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROBERT GARDNER

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/22/19.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING A

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY AND OFFICE ADDRESS BY KE DURASOL AWNINGSINC FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 8/19/19.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROBERT GARDNER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KE DURASOL AWNINGSINC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROBERT GARDNER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2019 OF ROBERT GARDNER BY KE DURASOL AWNINGSINC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF MUHAR GARBER AV& DUNCAN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR DECL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR DECLARATION GRANTING LEAVE TO INTERVENE BY MID-CENTRY INSURANCE COPANY FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT IN

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT INTERVENTION FILED 04/16/2019 OF MID-CENTRY INSURANCE COPANY AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/25/2019 OF KE DURASOL AWNINGSINC AS TO DEFENDANT SHADEMAKER INC FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY KE DURASOL AWNINGSINC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docket--ALSO AMENDING CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/25/2019 OF KE DURASOL AWNINGSINC NAMING ROES/MOES 2 TO BE ANTHONY RAMSEY--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docket--ALSO AMENDING CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/25/2019 OF KE DURASOL AWNINGSINC NAMING ROES/MOES 1 TO BE SHADEMAKER INC--

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIEN FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2019 OF ROBERT GARDNER AGAINST DONALD R HOLBEN & ASSOCIATES APC BY ROBERT GARDNER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2019 OF ROBERT GARDNER SERVED ON KE DURASOL AWNINGSINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/29/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/18/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2019 OF ROBERT GARDNER AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less