This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/29/2020 at 00:08:19 (UTC).

GARCIA VS REYES ESTRADA

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against REYES ESTRADA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0430

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTHER B GARCIA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

IDA MARTINEZ

Indio, CA 92201

JOSE VARGAS

MELISSA ZACARIAS

MARIA AZUCENA REYES ESTRADA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JOSE VARGAS

MARIA AZUCENA REYES ESTRADA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES V CICALESE

45841 Oasis St #6

Indio, CA 92201

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GOMES HIRSHIK & HUMMEL

16815 Von Karman Suite 250

Irvine, CA 92606

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN P SMITH & ASSOCIATES

13340 183Rd St Suite 100

Cerritos, CA 90703

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN P SMITH & ASSOCIATES

13340 183Rd St Suite 100

Cerritos, CA 90703

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2019 OF MARIA REYES ESTRADA FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY M

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MARIA AZUCENA REYES ESTRADA, JOSE VARGAS FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON 07/2

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON 07/26/19 BY JOSE VARGAS WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 07/31/19.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTE ORDER.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY IDA MARTINEZ.

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO CASE

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONF & OSC 7/16/19

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2019 OF ESTHER GARCIA AS TO DEFENDANT MELISSA ZACARIAS FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY MARIA

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY MARIA AZUCENA REYES ESTRADA, JOSE VARGAS FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2019 OF ESTHER GARCIA AS TO MARIA AZUCENA REYES ESTRADA; MAILING DATE OF 03/12/19 FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2019 OF ESTHER GARCIA BY IDA MARTINEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON JAMES V. CICALESE WITH A MAILING DATE OF 02/20/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY IDA MARTINEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK C. SOWDERS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2019 OF ESTHER GARCIA SERVED ON IDA MARTINEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/21/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92201.

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AGREEMENT/NONAGREEMENT DUE - CLERK'S CALENDAR.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketMEDIATION COMPLETION DATE 02/17/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL FROM MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMNARD HEARING SET FOR 01/02/20 AT 08:00 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: MEDIATORS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATOR'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OR RECUSAL TO COURT ORDERED MEDIATION FILED BY ROBERT T ANDERSEN. (ASSIGNMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRNCMD HEARING SET FOR 12/05/19 AT 08:00 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: MEDIATORS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMNARD HEARING SET FOR 01/27/20 AT 08:00 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: MEDIATORS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2019 OF MARIA REYES ESTRADA FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY IDA MARTINEZ (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FOR IDA MARTINEZ WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; $450.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY IDA MARTINEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK C. SOWDERS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2019 OF ESTHER GARCIA SERVED ON IDA MARTINEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/21/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2019 OF ESTHER GARCIA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/18/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less