This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 20:31:25 (UTC).

GARCIA vs MS FOODS LLC

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 GARCIA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MS FOODS LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Vineyard. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3305

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John W. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRANDI SMITH

ARLENE GARCIA

Defendants

MAHMOOD ASGHAR SAIFIE

HOOTERS OF AMERICALLC

MS FOODS LLC

HOOTERS OF AMERICA LLC

HOOTERS, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERONA, LANGER, BECK, SERBIN & HARRISON

Attorney at PERONA, LANGER, BECK, SERBIN & HARRISON

300 E San Antonio Drive

Long Beach, CA 90807-0948

Defendant Attorney

James Frederick Rumm

 

Court Documents

Defendant's Notice of Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs' Claims and Stay of Proceedings Filed on Complaint of ARLENE GARCIA

02/23/2021: Defendant's Notice of Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs' Claims and Stay of Proceedings Filed on Complaint of ARLENE GARCIA

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

02/16/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint of ARLENE GARCIA

02/01/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint of ARLENE GARCIA

Notice OF POSTING JURY FEES. ON COMPLAINT OF BRANDI SMITH

02/01/2021: Notice OF POSTING JURY FEES. ON COMPLAINT OF BRANDI SMITH

Tentative Rulings for 1/21/2021 Department 7

01/26/2021: Tentative Rulings for 1/21/2021 Department 7

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

01/13/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration by MS FOODS LLC, MAHMOOD ASGHAR SAIFIE

01/11/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration by MS FOODS LLC, MAHMOOD ASGHAR SAIFIE

PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS REPLY EVIDENCE

01/06/2021: PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS REPLY EVIDENCE

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

01/05/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Reply DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AND STAY ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

01/04/2021: Reply DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AND STAY ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Supplemental DECLARATION OF MARYAM SAIFIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

01/04/2021: Supplemental DECLARATION OF MARYAM SAIFIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Supplemental DECLARATION OF ROXANN IGLESIAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDING

01/04/2021: Supplemental DECLARATION OF ROXANN IGLESIAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDING

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes

12/30/2020: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

12/29/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs' Claims and Stay Proceedings

12/29/2020: Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs' Claims and Stay Proceedings

Declaration of Brandi Smith in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs' Claims and Stay Proceedings

12/29/2020: Declaration of Brandi Smith in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs' Claims and Stay Proceedings

Declaration of Arlene Garcia in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs' Claims and Stay Proceedings

12/29/2020: Declaration of Arlene Garcia in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs' Claims and Stay Proceedings

Certificate of Mailing

12/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant's Notice of Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs' Claims and Stay of Proceedings Filed on Complaint of ARLENE GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/03/2021; Fine Description: Check #D3809210 Receipt No.: 20210203-00356.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF POSTING JURY FEES. ON COMPLAINT OF BRANDI SMITH; Filed By: BRANDI SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint of ARLENE GARCIA; Filed By: ARLENE GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Tentative Rulings for 1/21/2021 Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of GARCIA served on MS FOODS LLC with service date of 09/15/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of ARLENE GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of GARCIA served on HOOTERS OF AMERICA LLC with service date of 09/15/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of ARLENE GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of GARCIA as to MAHMOOD ASGHAR SAIFIE; mailing date of 09/17/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/24/2020; Fine Description: Check #3753082 Receipt No.: CV200824-0185-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of GARCIA and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of ARLENE GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOOTERS is a litigant

Latest cases where HOOTERS AMERICA INC is a litigant