This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/11/2018 at 20:20:11 (UTC).

GARCIA VS MCNANEY

Case Summary

On 07/17/2002 GARCIA filed an Other lawsuit against MCNANEY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7666

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Minor and Plaintiff

JORGE GARCIA

Defendants

MICHAEL J MOEN

DANIELLE LYNN MCNANEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MIGUEL F. GARCIA

5842 E. Beverly Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90022

Defendant Attorney

BECK FLORY & SIRNA

6800 Indiana Avenue Suite 245

Riverside, CA 92506

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER $10,000 FILED.

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD L

ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2002 OF ROBERT GARCIA FOR JORGE GARCIA APPOINTING FRANCISCO GARCIA AS GUARDIAN; HONORABLE JUDGE E. MICHAEL KAISER.

PLT DECLARATION RE: ORDER TO S

PLT DECLARATION RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE OF DANIEL

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE OF DANIELLE LYNN MCNANEY FILED BY PLTF

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE OF MICHAE

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE OF MICHAEL J MOEN FILED BY PLTF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2002 OF ROBERT GARCIA SERVED ON DANIELLE LYNN MCNANEY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/29/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2002 OF ROBERT GARCIA AS TO MICHAEL J MOEN; MAILING DATE OF 10/30/02 FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DANIE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DANIELLE LYNN MCNANEY, MICHAEL J MOEN FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2002 OF ROBERT GARCIA BY DANIELLE LYNN MCNANEY, MICHAEL J MOEN REPRESENTED BY BECK FLORY & SIRNA FILED. (OVER $10,000)

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDGE

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDGE KAISER BY DEFENDANT IS GRANTED

REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR

REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITR

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATION HEARING ON 04/29/03 @ 02:30 AT LAW OFFICE

AWARD OF ARBITRATOR N THE AMOU

AWARD OF ARBITRATOR N THE AMOUNT OF 25,000.00 OR LESS FILED.

REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO FILE

REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO FILED BY DANIELLE LYNN MCNANEY, MICHAEL J MOEN (USE RTDN) PVIOLA

NOTICE OF RULING RE: POST ARBI

NOTICE OF RULING RE: POST ARBITRATION REVIEW HEARING FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2002 OF ROBERT GARCIA AS TO PLAINTIFF ROBERT GARCIA FILED

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OF JORGE GARCIA FILED.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLTFFS LODGING OF CONFIRMATION OF COURT BLOCKED ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2002 OF ROBERT GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2003
  • DocketDISMISSAL FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2003
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2002 OF ROBERT GARCIA SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 10/15/03.; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY; HONORABLE JUDGE STEPHEN D CUNNISON.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF CLAIM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM HONORABLE JUDGE STEPHEN D CUNNISON.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2003
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OF JORGE GARCIA; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2003
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2002 OF ROBERT GARCIA SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 09/04/03.; Disposition: Entire Case Settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2003
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF CLAIM SET FOR 9/19/03 AT 13:30 IN DEPARTMENT 01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2002
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: OSC SET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2002
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2002 OF ROBERT GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2002 OF ROBERT GARCIA FOR JORGE GARCIA APPOINTING FRANCISCO GARCIA AS GUARDIAN; HONORABLE JUDGE E. MICHAEL KAISER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2002
  • DocketAPP/ORDER FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM W/SUMMONS REC'D & FORWD TO DEPT. 03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2002
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT(S) SUMMONS AND APPL FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM SUBMITTED BY ROBERT GARCIA FOR THE REASON: INCORRECT FORM *SEE FORM ATTACHED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2002
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT(S) CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL SUBMITTED BY ROBERT GARCIA FOR THE REASON: SIGNATURE REQUIRED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2002
  • DocketNON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 9/26/02 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2002
  • DocketDIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER $10,000 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF MIGUEL F GARCIA