This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/12/2020 at 23:06:06 (UTC).

GARCIA VS FINANCIAL SERVICES FUNDING GROUP

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 GARCIA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FINANCIAL SERVICES FUNDING GROUP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3580

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARMEN GARCIA

SALVADOR GARCIA JR

Defendants

WESTLAKE ESCROW INC

FIRST GIBRALTAR BANK FSB

FINANCIAL SERVICESFUNDING GROUP OF SOUTHER

BANK AMERICA CORP

CORINTHIAN TITLE COMPANY INC

NATIONSBANK CORP

BANK OF AMERICA TEXAS NA

FIRST TEXAS SAVINGS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REID & HELLYER

3880 Lemon St., 5Th Fl.

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CARMEN GARCIA AS TO FIRST TEXAS SAVINGSASSOCIATION, FIRST GIBRALTAR BANK FSB FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CARMEN GARCIA AS TO FINANCIAL SERVICESFUNDING GROUP OF SOUTHER FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON (SEE SERVICE LIST) WITH A MAILING DATE OF 10/08/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CARME

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CARMEN GARCIA FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2019 OF CARMEN GARCIA AS TO WESTLAKE ESCROW INC; MAILING DATE OF 07/11/19 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2019 OF CARMEN GARCIA SERVED ON BANK AMERICA CORP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/09/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2019 OF CARMEN GARCIA SERVED ON FINANCIAL SERVICESFUNDING GROUP OF SOUTHER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/12/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2019 OF CARMEN GARCIA SERVED ON BANK OF AMERICA TEXAS NA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/03/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2019 OF CARMEN GARCIA SERVED ON NATIONSBANK CORP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/03/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2019 OF CARMEN GARCIA SERVED ON BANK AMERICA CORP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/03/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2019 OF CARMEN GARCIA AND FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCARMEN GARCIA, SALVADOR GARCIA JR/REID & HELLYER IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE A TIMELY CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CRC 3.725(A)).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCARMEN GARCIA, SALVADOR GARCIA JR/REID & HELLYER IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF ALL.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY CARMEN GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCOURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: RE: 12-26-19 HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY CARMEN GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2019 OF CARMEN GARCIA SERVED ON BANK AMERICA CORP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/03/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2019 OF CARMEN GARCIA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 10/28/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORINTHIAN TITLE COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationsbank (na) is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant