This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/10/2020 at 00:23:20 (UTC).

GARCIA VS CITY OF DESERT HOT SPRINGS

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 GARCIA filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF DESERT HOT SPRINGS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7458

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

NADINE GARCIA

JAMES MARMOR

HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY

Respondents

DESERT HOT SPRINGSCITY COUNCIL

DESERT HOT SPRINGSHOUSING AUTHORITY

CITY OF DESERT HOTSPRINGS

DESERT HOT SPRINGSSUCCESSOR AGENCY

Interested Party

RIVERSIDE COUNTY OVERSIGHT BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

INLAND COUNTIES LEGAL SERVICESINC

10565 Civic Dr #200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

PUBLIC INTEREST LAW PROJECT

449 15Th Street Suite 301

Oakland, CA 94612

INLAND COUNTIES LEGAL SERVICES

3500 Porsche Way Suite 200

Ontario, CA 91764

Respondent Attorneys

STREAM KIM HICKS WRAGE ALFARO

3403 Tenth Street Suite 700

Riverside, CA 92501

QUINTANILLA & ASSOCIATES

Po Box 176

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

Interested Party Attorney

GOLDFARB & LIPMAN LLP

1300 Clay St, 11Th Floor City Center Plaza

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VACATING OF MOTION T

NOTICE OF VACATING OF MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT BY NADINE GARCIA, JAMES MARMOR, HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SA

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SANG BANH IN SUPP OF PETITIONERS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES FILED

RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO REQ

RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO REQ FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE/ATTY FEES BY NADINE GARCIA, JAMES MARMOR, HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY NADINE GARCIA, JAMES MARMOR, HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY.

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER MIZRAH

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER MIZRAHI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS BY PETITIONERS/PLAINTIFFS.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF MOTION FOR ATTYORNEYS FEES & SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 02/24/20 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

STIPULATED JUDGMENT (ENTIRE AC

STIPULATED JUDGMENT (ENTIRE ACTION) FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

DECLARATION OF MELISSA A MORRI

DECLARATION OF MELISSA A MORRIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON WRIT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON WRIT OF MANDAMUS FILED 12/03/2018 OF NADINE GARCIA AS TO DEFENDANT DESERT HOT SPRINGSSUCCESSOR AGENCY, RIVERSIDE COUNTY OVERSIGHT BOARD FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONERS REQ

OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONERS REQ F/JUDICIAL NTC IN SUPPORT BY DEFENDNATS FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CITY OF DESERT HOTSPRINGS, DESERT HOT SPRINGSCITY COUNCIL, DESERT HOT SPRINGSSUCCESSOR AGENCY, DESERT HOT SPRINGSHOUSING AUTHORITY.

FILED: JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE

FILED: JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

FILED: JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE

FILED: JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATU

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE BY NADINE GARCIA, JAMES MARMOR, HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE WRIT O

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE WRIT OF MANDAMUS FILED 12/03/2018 OF NADINE GARCIA SERVED ON CITY OF DESERT HOTSPRINGS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/18/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2 - WRIT OF MANDATE/PROHIBITION/REVIEW (PALM SPRINGS)

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS BY NADINE GARCIA, JAMES MARMOR, HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY CITY OF DESERT HOTSPRINGS, DESERT HOT SPRINGSCITY COUNCIL, DESERT HOT SPRINGSSUCCESSOR AGENCY, DESERT HOT SPRINGSHOUSING AUTHORITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT'S RULING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS DATED 06/23/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketASSIGN TO LEGAL RESEARCH ATTORNEY: DM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VACATING OF MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT BY NADINE GARCIA, JAMES MARMOR, HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS BY NADINE GARCIA, JAMES MARMOR, HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCOURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: COURT ORDERED TRANSCRIPT; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCOURT ON ITS OWN MOTION SET ON 6/11/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPOS TIMELY/WAIVED - PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION TO/FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS ON CALENDAR 06/11/20 IS TIMELY/WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR ENFORCE JUDGMENT BY NADINE GARCIA, JAMES MARMOR, HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JAMES MARMOR IS GRANTED; CLERK C. SOWDERS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY IS GRANTED; CLERK C. SOWDERS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY NADINE GARCIA IS GRANTED; CLERK C. SOWDERS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FOR HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; $450.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FOR NADINE GARCIA WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; $450.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCHANGE ATTORNEY ON NADINE GARCIA FROM PRO/PER TO INLAND COUNTIES LEGAL SERVICESINC ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Docket--ALSO ASSOCIATE WRIT OF MANDAMUS FILED 12/03/2018 OF NADINE GARCIA PUBLIC INTEREST LAWPROJECT FOR NADINE GARCIA, JAMES MARMOR, HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCHANGE ATTORNEY ON HELEN O'NEILL-POTTERY FROM PRO/PER TO INLAND COUNTIES LEGAL SERVICESINC ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCHANGE ATTORNEY ON JAMES MARMOR FROM PRO/PER TO INLAND COUNTIES LEGAL SERVICESINC ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less