This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 02:46:51 (UTC).

FRANCO VS US FOODS INC

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 FRANCO filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against US FOODS INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Sunshine Sykes, Craig Riemer and Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4073

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Sunshine Sykes

Craig Riemer

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAN FRANCO

Defendants

US FOODS INC

US FOODSERVICE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACKERMANN & TILAJEF PC

Attorney at ACKERMANN & TILAJEF PC

1180 South Beverly Dr Ste. 610

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Defendant Attorney

Eric E. Hill

 

Court Documents

SECOND REVISED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

07/30/2021: SECOND REVISED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Minute Order: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

07/30/2021: Minute Order: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

Supplemental Declaration of Craig J. Ackermann in Support of Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Approval of Notice to Class Members & Related Materials; Approval of Settlement Administrator; & Setting Hearing for Final Approv

07/23/2021: Supplemental Declaration of Craig J. Ackermann in Support of Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Approval of Notice to Class Members & Related Materials; Approval of Settlement Administrator; & Setting Hearing for Final Approval of Settlement

Tentative Rulings for July 9, 2021

07/09/2021: Tentative Rulings for July 9, 2021

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.

07/09/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.

Minute Order: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

07/09/2021: Minute Order: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

Supplemental declaration of Craig J. Ackerman in support of plaintiff's motion

06/29/2021: Supplemental declaration of Craig J. Ackerman in support of plaintiff's motion

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of JUAN FRANCO

06/15/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of JUAN FRANCO

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.

06/15/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.

Tentative Rulings for June 9, 2021 Department 3

06/10/2021: Tentative Rulings for June 9, 2021 Department 3

Certificate of Mailing

06/09/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

06/09/2021: Minute Order: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continuance of hearings

06/09/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continuance of hearings

Joint Case Management Statement

06/09/2021: Joint Case Management Statement

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of JUAN FRANCO

05/26/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of JUAN FRANCO

Declaration of Juan Franco in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

05/17/2021: Declaration of Juan Franco in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

Declaration of Craig J Ackermann in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

05/17/2021: Declaration of Craig J Ackermann in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

Compliance Chart Pursuant to the Court's Case Management Order in Support of Unopposed Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

05/17/2021: Compliance Chart Pursuant to the Court's Case Management Order in Support of Unopposed Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re: FINAL APPROVAL; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingType: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: SECOND REVISED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; Filed By: JUAN FRANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Second Revised Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Supplemental Declaration of Craig J. Ackermann in Support of Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Approval of Notice to Class Members & Related Materials; Approval of Settlement Administrator; & Setting Hearing for Final Approval of Settlement; Filed By: JUAN FRANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • HearingType: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of service by Mail of see document list on see service list with a mailing date of 10/22/20 filed. (non-complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of FRANCO served on US FOODS INC with service date of 10/19/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of JUAN FRANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/15/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #3662 Receipt No.: CV201015-0089-FE.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/15/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #3662 Receipt No.: CV201015-0087-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Assignment to Department and Case Management Conference (CRC 3.722).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92879.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of FRANCO and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed - Class Action. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of JUAN FRANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US FOODS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where US Foodservice Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric E. Hill