This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/09/2020 at 23:03:41 (UTC).

FR THE RANCH VS TURN KEY LOGISTICS

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 FR THE RANCH filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against TURN KEY LOGISTICS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0867

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FR THE RANCH LLC

Defendants

TURN KEY LOGISTICSINC

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD L SEIDE APC

901 Dove St Ste 120

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2019 OF FR THE RANCH LLC AS TO TURN KEY LOGISTICSINC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2019 OF FR THE RANCH LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO TURN KEY LOGISTICSINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/28/19 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2019 OF FR THE RANCH LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTSIN POSSESSION, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 09/30/19 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2019 OF FR THE RANCH LLC AND FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER $25,000 (CORONA)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY FR THE RANCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2019 OF FR THE RANCH LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTSIN POSSESSION, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 09/30/19 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2019 OF FR THE RANCH LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO TURN KEY LOGISTICSINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/28/19 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2019 OF FR THE RANCH LLC AS TO TURN KEY LOGISTICSINC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER $25,000 (CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT C1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2019 OF FR THE RANCH LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 11/26/19 AT 8:00 IN CLEC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FR THE RANCH, LLC is a litigant