This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 16:15:32 (UTC).

FOOTHILLS VS ROCHE

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 FOOTHILLS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROCHE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0952

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOOTHILLS AT OLD TOWN LLC

Claimant and Other

JEREMIAH LOFTON

Temecula, CA 92590

Defendants

TRACY ROCHE

Temecula, CA 92950

TRACY BENEFEITO

Temecula, CA 92590

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY FOOTHILLS AT OLD TOWN LLC.

CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION A

CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AND NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY JEREMIAH LOFTON PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46(E)(2).

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JEREMIAH LOFTON IS GRANTED; CLERK J PRENDERGAST (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER FOR CLAIM OF RIGHT TO PO

ORDER FOR CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK (FORM RI-006).

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR VA

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT/STAYING EXECUTION BY TRACY BENEFEITO FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

ORDER FOR / ON PREVIOUSLY ISSU

ORDER FOR / ON PREVIOUSLY ISSUED WRIT OF POSSESSION IS DENIED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ST

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR STAYING EXECUTION BY TRACY BENEFEITO FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

ORDER FOR / ON PREVIOUSLY ISSU

ORDER FOR / ON PREVIOUSLY ISSUED WRIT OF POSSESSION IS DENIED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE KELLY L HANSEN.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92590.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUM

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2017 OF FOOTHILLS AT OLD TOWN LLC FILED BY TRACY ROCHE REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. (UNDER $10,000)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY TRACY ROCHE IS GRANTED; CLERK J PRENDERGAST (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND ATHORITIES BY FOOTHILLS AT OLD TOWN LLC FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 07/28/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEMURRER + DEMURRER SERVED ON LAW OFFICES OF KIMBALL, TIREY + ST JOHN LLP SERVED 08/02/17 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR AN

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME BY FOOTHILLS AT OLD TOWN LLC FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; MEMORA

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY FOOTHILLS AT OLD TOWN LLC FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/11/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/22/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT/STAYING EXECUTION (SOUTHWEST).; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE STAYING EXECUTION.; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR / ON PREVIOUSLY ISSUED WRIT OF POSSESSION IS DENIED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE KELLY L HANSEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 9/22/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT S205

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR STAYING EXECUTION BY TRACY BENEFEITO FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR / ON PREVIOUSLY ISSUED WRIT OF POSSESSION IS DENIED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET 9/22/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • MOTION FEE POSTED BY TRACY BENEFEITO

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY FOOTHILLS AT OLD TOWN LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/14/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2017 OF FOOTHILLS AT OLD TOWN LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92590.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less