This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 15:15:38 (UTC).

FIRST RESOLUTION VS LINDBERGH

Case Summary

On 02/18/2011 FIRST RESOLUTION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LINDBERGH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0056

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Blythe Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION

Defendant

JENEL M LINDBERGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

110 E Wilshire Avenue Suite 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

KENOSIAN & MIELE

8581 Santa Monica Blvd. #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 26

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 (COLLECTION) - BLYTHE

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/18/2011 OF FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/18/2011 OF FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION SERVED ON JENEL M LINDBERGH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/15/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/18/2011 OF FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/18/2011 OF FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION AS TO JENEL M LINDBERGH.

DECLARATION OF UNDERLYING ACTI

DECLARATION OF UNDERLYING ACTION OF ACCOUNT STATED FILED

DECLARATION OF WAIVER OF ATTOR

DECLARATION OF WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED

DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTERES

DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1383.36 FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED (ENTIRE ACTION)

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.

AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERV

AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/18/2011 OF FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION REMOVE ATTORNEY WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION FOR PARTY(S) FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY KENOSIAN & MIELE

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; SACRAMENTO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $3087.27 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/18/2011 OF FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION REMOVE ATTORNEY WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION FOR PARTY(S) FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY KENOSIAN & MIELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; SACRAMENTO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $1904.63 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF UNDERLYING ACTION OF ACCOUNT STATED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/18/2011 OF FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION AS TO JENEL M LINDBERGH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/18/2011 OF FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/18/2011 OF FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION SERVED ON JENEL M LINDBERGH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/15/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 2/17/12 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. 260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/18/2011 OF FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (BLYTHE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 (COLLECTION) - BLYTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less