This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 19:58:14 (UTC).

FETZ VS US HOME CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/19/2008 FETZ filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against US HOME CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1935

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SARA BALDER

ANH-NGUYET DESTATTE

Intervenor Plaintiff and Interested Party

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL SPECIALTY LINES

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

US HOME CORPORATION

Cross Defendants

SUNSHINE NURSERIES

PETERSEN-DEAN INC

GOLDEN STATE FENCECO

ROES 1-500 INCLUSIVE

RANDY BOGS MASONRY

WALTERS PLUMBING

FARRAR MASONRY

J.TALLEY CORPORATION

INTERIOR SPECIALISTS

MERILLAT CORPORATION

RABBIT CONSTRUCTION

PRO COAT SYSTEMS

SUN COAST POST TENSION LTD

SCOTT ELECTRIC

TALLEY OCHOA

CENTURY CAST PRODUCTS

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OFROBERT CLAUSEN

1400 Bristol Street North Suite 145

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Intervenor Plaintiff and Interested Party Attorney

WEIL & DRAGE APC

23212 Mill Creek Drive

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN & HALL A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1851 East First Street 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D COHEN

1551 N Tustin Ave #750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

LAW OFFICES OF CRAIG J SILVER

1525 Mesa Verde Dr E #210

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

STEWART & EUM

505 N Brand Boulevard Suite 1110

Glendale, CA 91203

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

DALE BRADEN & HINCHCLIFFE

888 West Sixth St Sixth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 Town Center Dr #1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Other Attorneys

LEWIS, BRISBOIS, BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

550 West C Street Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

2601 Airport Drive Ste 105

Torrance, CA 90505

MARSHALL, FRENCH & DEGRAVE

17901 Von Karman Ave. Ste 300

Irvine, CA 92614-7235

TYSON & MENDES

5661 La Jolla Blvd.

La Jolla, CA 92037

BRADY VORWERCK RYDER & CASPINO

One City Blvd West 18Th Floor

Orange, CA 92868-3622

LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & FRASER

One Mac Arthur Place Ste.650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

SUSSON, PARRETT & ODELL

18201 Von Karman Avenue Suite 1020

Irvine, CA 92612

LAW OFFICE OF KEVIN PEGAN .

One Mac Arthur Place Suite-310

Santa Ana, CA 92707

AUSTIN BROWNWOOD & CANNON

525 B Street #1000

San Diego, CA 92101

JACKS & MAYBAUM LLP

811 Wilshire Blvd #975

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/19/2008 OF MANFRED FETZ AND FILED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 12/12/08

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 12/12/08

NOTICE OF STATUS CONF. FILED B

NOTICE OF STATUS CONF. FILED BY PLAINTIFFS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/19/2008 OF MANFRED FETZ BY US HOME CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY GREEN & HALL A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF US HOME COR

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF US HOME CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY GREEN & HALL A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2009 OF US HOME CORPORATION AND FILED.

STIP AND ORDER TRANFER OF VENU

STIP AND ORDER TRANFER OF VENUE ,

MINUTES COURT ORDERS CASE TRAN

MINUTES COURT ORDERS CASE TRANSFER TO RIVERSIDE CO

STIP AND ORDER AMENDMENT TO CO

STIP AND ORDER AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK -

COMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK - TRANSFER

CERTIFIED COPY OF REGISTER OF

CERTIFIED COPY OF REGISTER OF ACTION FILED

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS FILED.

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS FILED.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER

NOTICE OF TRANSFER

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FOR

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES NOTICE OF CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE BY MANFRED FETZ, CHRISTIANE FETZ FILED.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE , BY US

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE , BY US HOME CORPORATION FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2009 OF US HOME CORPORATION NAMING ROES/MOES 01 TO BE ACCENT TILE FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MANFRED FETZ

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2011
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2009 OF US HOME CORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY US HOME CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/19/2008 OF MANFRED FETZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON MERILLAT CORPORATION WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/24/09 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2009 OF US HOME CORPORATION FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL BY US HOME CORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
223 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES COURT ORDERS CASE TRANSFER TO RIVERSIDE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP AND ORDER TRANFER OF VENUE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2009 OF US HOME CORPORATION AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF US HOME CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY GREEN & HALL A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/19/2008 OF MANFRED FETZ BY US HOME CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY GREEN & HALL A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/19/2008 OF MANFRED FETZ AS TO US HOME CORPORATION ATTORNEY GREEN & HALL A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONF. FILED BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 12/12/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/19/2008 OF MANFRED FETZ AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALTERS PLUMBING is a litigant

Latest cases where SCOTT ELECTRIC is a litigant

Latest cases where MERILLAT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where J. TALLEY CORPORATION is a litigant