Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 07:19:34 (UTC).

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES VS CATHEDERAL

Case Summary

On 02/11/2004 FERGUSON ENTERPRISES filed an Other lawsuit against CATHEDERAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1221

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CATHEDRAL/CREEKSIDE LP

EAST WEST BANK

BARONET & CO INC.

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

SURETY COMPANY OF THE PACIFIC

BESTCAL INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HAROLD STEVEN THORNTON

TRACY LYNN HERZOG

JOSEPH ELMER PURCELL

BESTCAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SYKULSKI, GEORGE

16027 Ventura Blvd. Suite 503

Encino, CA 91436-2793

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF KARI L LEY

264 Clovis Avenue Suite 208

Clovis, CA 93612

GEISSLER & NIMOY

Encino Office Park Ii Ste 325 6345 Balboa Blvd

Encino, CA 91316

BARRUS AND ROBERTSP.C.

7112 North Fresno St Suite 140

Fresno, CA 93720

 

Court Documents

PETITION FILED

PETITION FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/11/2004 OF FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC BY EAST WEST BANK REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KARIL LEY FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL - BY FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/14/2004 OF CATHEDRAL/CREEKSIDELP SERVED ON SURETY COMPANY OF THE PACIFIC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/09/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FUR ANSWE

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FUR ANSWERS TO RQST FOR ADMISSION AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST EAST WEST BANK &/OR ITS ATTY BY FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC FILED

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FUR RESP

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FUR RESP TO DOC DEMAND & FOR SANCTIONS AGAI NST EAST WEST BANK &/OR ITS ATTY KARI LEY BY FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC FILED

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FUR ANSWE

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FUR ANSWERS TO ROGS & FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST CATHEDRAL CREEKSIDE &/OR ITS ATTY BY FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/14/2004 OF CATHEDRAL/CREEKSIDELP SERVED ON JOSEPH ELMER PURCELL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/03/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MTN TO COMPEL FUR RESPONSES TO ROGS & RWST FOR ADMISSIONS & FOR SANCTIONS BY CATHEDRAL/CR.

REPLY TO CATHEDRAL CREEKSIDES

REPLY TO CATHEDRAL CREEKSIDES OPPO TO MTNS TO COMPEL FUR BY FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC FILED

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF BARONET & C

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF BARONET & CO INC. REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KARIL LEY FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/16/2004 OF SURETY COMPANY OF THE PACIFIC AS TO BESTCAL INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, HAROLD STEVEN THORNTON, TRACY LYNN HERZOG FILED.

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL RESP TO D

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL RESP TO DOCUMENT DEMAND DOCUMENTS AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEF CATHEDRAL CREEKSIDE BY FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC FILED

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ANSWERS T

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ANSWERS TO SEPCIAL ROGS AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEF CATHEDRAL CREEKSIDE BY FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC FILED

MOTION TO/FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICA

MOTION TO/FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO THE 2ND CAUSE & 4TH CAUSE OF ACTION OF PLTFS COMPLAINT BY FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC.

LETTER RECEIVED FROM GEORGE SY

LETTER RECEIVED FROM GEORGE SYKULSKI ATTY FOR PLTF (DATED 3/15/05) RE: TAKING DISCOVERY MTNS OF 3/16 OFF CALENDAR AND FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/16/2004 OF SURETY COMPANY OF THE PACIFIC FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2009
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (ENTIRE ACTION) FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR ENTER JUDGMENT ON SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 BY BARONET & CO INC.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF BARONET & CO INC MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT ON SETTLEMENT BY BARONET & CO INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CHARLES R ASHLEY I/S OF BARONET & CO INC MOTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO/FOR ENTER JUDGMENT ON SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 BY BARONET & CO INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2006
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2005
  • HEARING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE RE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CATHEDRAL/CREEKSIDELP REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KARIL LEY FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/11/2004 OF FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC BY CATHEDRAL/CREEKSIDELP REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KARIL LEY FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/11/2004 OF FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC AS TO CATHEDRAL/CREEKSIDELP; MAILING DATE OF 03/31/04 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/11/2004 OF FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC BY EAST WEST BANK REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KARIL LEY FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/11/2004 OF FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC SERVED ON EAST WEST BANK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/25/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/11/2004 OF FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2004
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES (NOTICE TO COUNSEL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETY COMPANY OF THE PACIFIC A CALIFO is a litigant

Latest cases where FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases where EAST WEST BANK is a litigant