This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 13:35:08 (UTC).

FELIX VS SMITH/SMITH

Case Summary

On 08/15/2006 FELIX filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SMITH/SMITH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3543

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIDIA L FELIX

Blythe, CA 92226

Defendants

HAROLD SMITH

Blythe, CA 92225

MELODY SMITH

Blythe, CA 92225

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT BY CLERK.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2006 OF LIDIA FELIX SERVED ON HAROLD SMITH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/15/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2006 OF LIDIA FELIX SERVED ON MELODY SMITH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/16/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2006 OF LIDIA FELIX BY MELODY SMITH REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2006 OF LIDIA FELIX BY HAROLD SMITH REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAIN

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LIDIA L FELIX - BLYTHE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2007
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2006
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2006
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2006
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER (BLYTHE) SET 9/08/06 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LIDIA L FELIX - BLYTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2006 OF LIDIA FELIX BY HAROLD SMITH REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2006 OF LIDIA FELIX BY MELODY SMITH REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS FILED BY MELODY SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS FILED BY HAROLD SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2006 OF LIDIA FELIX SERVED ON MELODY SMITH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/16/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2006 OF LIDIA FELIX SERVED ON HAROLD SMITH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/15/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/29/06 AT 10:00 IN 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 - BLYTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less