This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/06/2016 at 01:02:26 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE VS ACOSTA

Case Summary

On 04/13/2011 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ACOSTA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0531

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendants

LEO ACOSTA

LILLIAN ACOSTA

BILL HAYNES

ANNE MARIE ARES

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE WOLF FIRM

2955 Main St Second Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER C

SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2011 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION FILED

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAI

PROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAIL, OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2011 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION AS TO LEO ACOSTA WITH MAILING DATE OF 04/28/11

PROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAI

PROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAIL, OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2011 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION AS TO LILLIAN ACOSTA WITH MAILING DATE OF 04/28/11

PROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAI

PROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAIL, OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2011 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION AS TO BILL HAYNES WITH MAILING DATE OF 04/28/11

PROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAI

PROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAIL, OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2011 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION AS TO ANNE MARIE ARES WITH MAILING DATE OF 04/28/11

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2011 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION AS TO LEO ACOSTA, LILLIAN ACOSTA, BILL HAYNES, ANNE MARIE ARES, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAI

PROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAIL, OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2011 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) WITH MAILING DATE OF 04/28/11

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 05/24/11

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WR

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE MO FOR

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE MO FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATING JUDGMN (BANNING)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BILL HAYNES IS GRANTED; CLERK K STAFF (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

DECLARATION OF RE: NOTICE OF E

DECLARATION OF RE: NOTICE OF EXPARTE APPLICATION FILED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • DocketEX PARTE HEARING RE MO FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT/VACTING JUDGMNT.; Disposition: Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF RE: NOTICE OF EXPARTE APPLICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY BILL HAYNES (FORM FW-001).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BILL HAYNES IS GRANTED; CLERK K STAFF (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FOR BILL HAYNES WAS GRANTED FOR EXP MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; $255.00 WAIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • DocketEX PARTE HEARING SET ON 7/05/11 AT 13:30 IN DEPT B1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION RE MO FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATING JUDGMN (BANNING)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAIL, OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2011 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION AS TO BILL HAYNES WITH MAILING DATE OF 04/28/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAIL, OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2011 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION AS TO LILLIAN ACOSTA WITH MAILING DATE OF 04/28/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE, POST AND MAIL, OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2011 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION AS TO LEO ACOSTA WITH MAILING DATE OF 04/28/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2011 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 6/15/11 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant