This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 19:16:56 (UTC).

FEDERAL HOME LOANS VS ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 08/24/2011 FEDERAL HOME LOANS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0255

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Blythe Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL HOME LOANSCORPORATION

Defendants

EDDIE ALVAREZ

ESMERALDA ALVAREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TIMOTHY B. LIEBAERT & ASSOCIATES

634 Oak Ct.

San Bernardino, CA 92410

JOHN E BOUZANE & ASSOCIATES

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/24/2011 OF FEDERAL HOME LOANSCORPORATION AND FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/24/2011 OF FEDERAL HOME LOANSCORPORATION AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO EDDIE ALVAREZ; AND MAILED ON 09/02/11 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/24/2011 OF FEDERAL HOME LOANSCORPORATION AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ESMERALDA ALVAREZ; AND MAILED ON 09/02/11 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/24/2011 OF FEDERAL HOME LOANSCORPORATION AS TO EDDIE ALVAREZ, ESMERALDA ALVAREZ

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER POSSESSION FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WR

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT ON

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/24/2011 OF FEDERAL HOME LOANSCORPORATION AS TO EDDIE ALVAREZ, ESMERALDA ALVAREZ FILED

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR COPI

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL/DEFAULT JUDG BY COURT BY FEDERAL HOME LOANSCORPORATION FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SARAH A CHRISTIAN.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT U

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SARAH A CHRISTIAN.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED RIVERSIDE COUNTY

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $126.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $126.00.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $126.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $126.00.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED RIVERSIDE COUNTY

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSERVED RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $126.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $1653.98 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $126.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $1653.98 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIMOTHY B LIEBAERT BY FEDERAL HOME LOANSCORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/24/2011 OF FEDERAL HOME LOANSCORPORATION AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ESMERALDA ALVAREZ; AND MAILED ON 09/02/11 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/24/2011 OF FEDERAL HOME LOANSCORPORATION AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO EDDIE ALVAREZ; AND MAILED ON 09/02/11 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/11/11 AT 8:00 IN CUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/24/2011 OF FEDERAL HOME LOANSCORPORATION AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER BLYTHE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.