Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 16:44:17 (UTC).

FAIRFIELD VS BACON

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 FAIRFIELD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BACON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1009

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAIRFIELD SOLANA RIDGE LLC

Defendant

ELAYNE BACON

Temecula, CA 92591

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF FAIRFIELD SOLANA RIDGE LLC AND FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF FAIRFIELD SOLANA RIDGE LLC BY ELAYNE BACON REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ELAYNE BACON IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON KIMBALL TIRE & ST JOHN WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/26/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF FAIRFIELD SOLANA RIDGE LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ELAYNE BACON; AND MAILED ON 06/22/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF FAIRFIELD SOLANA RIDGE LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/22/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF FAIRFIELD SOLANA RIDGE LLC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY FAIRFIELD SOLANA RIDGE LLC - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

EXHIBIT LIST FILED

EXHIBIT LIST FILED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY FAIRFIELD SOLANA RIDGE LLC.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 07/28/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED.

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2018
  • CLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • CLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 3/22/18 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. SWEXH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 07/28/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY FAIRFIELD SOLANA RIDGE LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT LIST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2017
  • ELAYNE BACON ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ELAYNE BACON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF FAIRFIELD SOLANA RIDGE LLC BY ELAYNE BACON REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/21/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF FAIRFIELD SOLANA RIDGE LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less