This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/26/2018 at 07:09:52 (UTC).

FAIN VS TAMULINAS

Case Summary

On 02/16/2016 FAIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TAMULINAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0289

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAM FAIN

Defendants

WALTER TAMULINAS

MORRIS MIKE COCOS

TOVA OREN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS ORDER ON REQUEST

SMALL CLAIMS ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN FILED BY TOVA OREN; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK. (SC-105A)

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN SERVED ON MORRIS MIKE COCOS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/19/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $250.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN AS TO WALTER TAMULINAS, MAILING DATE OF 02/19/16 FILED. COSTS OF $250.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN AS TO TOVA OREN, MAILING DATE OF 02/19/16 FILED. COSTS OF $250.00.

SMALL CLAIMS REQUEST FOR COURT

SMALL CLAIMS REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER, PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN FILED BY TOVA OREN. (SC-105 PAGE 1 OF 2)

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLA

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN RESET FILED.

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAI

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY TOVA OREN FILED

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (SOUTHWEST).

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Reset Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN FILED BY TOVA OREN; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK. (SC-105A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN SERVED ON MORRIS MIKE COCOS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/19/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $250.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN AS TO WALTER TAMULINAS, MAILING DATE OF 02/19/16 FILED. COSTS OF $250.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN AS TO TOVA OREN, MAILING DATE OF 02/19/16 FILED. COSTS OF $250.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER, PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN FILED BY TOVA OREN. (SC-105 PAGE 1 OF 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 02/16/2016 OF ADAM FAIN RESET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 04/21/16 AT 08:00 IS RESET FOR 06/08/16; REASON REQUEST TO POSTPONE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 6/08/16, AT 8:00, IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY TOVA OREN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL/REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER SUBMITTED BY TOVA OREN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL SUBMITTED BY TOVA OREN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • CLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 4/21/16, AT 8:00, IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • FAX FILING BY ADAM FAIN ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT S205. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less